blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2167302

EP2167302 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HOLLOW BODIES FROM THERMOPLASTIC PLASTIC, DEVICE FOR PERFORMING SAID METHOD, AND FUEL CONTAINER THUS PRODUCED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kautex Textron GmbH & Co. KG
Kautexstr. 52
53229 Bonn / DE
[2015/24]
Former [2010/13]For all designated states
Kautex Textron Gmbh&Co. Kg
Kautexstr. 52
53229 Bonn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ECKHARDT, Joachim
Finkenweg 38
53229 Bonn / DE
02 / FRANKE-MAINTZ, Matthias
Dambroicher Str. 75
53773 Hennef / DE
03 / WOLTER, Gerd
Longenburger Strasse 37
53639 Königswinter / DE
 [2010/13]
Representative(s)Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 100411
51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/04]Kierdorf Ritschel
Sattlerweg 14
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2013/25]polypatent BGL
Sattlerweg 14
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2013/22]polypatent BGL
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2012/02]Polypatent
Postfach 10 04 11
51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2010/13]Polypatent
Postfach 11 07
51482 Overath / DE
Application number, filing date08749354.007.05.2008
[2010/13]
WO2008EP03633
Priority number, dateDE2007102888120.06.2007         Original published format: DE102007028881
[2015/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008154988
Date:24.12.2008
Language:DE
[2008/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2167302
Date:31.03.2010
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2167302
Date:10.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2008
ClassificationIPC:B29C49/42, B29C69/00, B29C49/04, B32B27/00
[2010/13]
CPC:
B29C49/4205 (EP,US); B29D22/003 (US); B29C49/0691 (EP,US);
B29C51/267 (EP,US); B60K15/03 (US); B29C2049/2008 (EP,US);
B29C2049/7871 (EP); B29C2791/006 (EP,US); B29C2791/007 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0054 (EP); B29C49/04 (EP,US); B29C49/06914 (EP,US);
B29C49/20 (EP,US); B29C49/22 (EP,US); B29K2995/0082 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7172 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2010/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOHLKÖRPERN AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEM KUNSTSTOFF, EINRICHTUNG DAZA UND HERGESTELLTER KRAFTSOFFBEHÄLTER[2010/13]
English:METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HOLLOW BODIES FROM THERMOPLASTIC PLASTIC, DEVICE FOR PERFORMING SAID METHOD, AND FUEL CONTAINER THUS PRODUCED[2010/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CORPS CREUX EN MATIÈRE SYNTHÉTIQUE THERMOPLASTIQUE, DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ ET RÉCIPIENT EN MATIÈRE SYNTHÉTIQUE AINSI FABRIQUÉ[2010/13]
Entry into regional phase01.10.2009National basic fee paid 
01.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.2009Examination requested  [2010/13]
31.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2015Fee for grant paid
17.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.05.2010
Opposition(s)11.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.05.2008
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
[2018/32]
Former [2018/29]HU07.05.2008
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2018/28]HU07.05.2008
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2017/40]CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/20]CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS60125633  (KYORAKU CO LTD) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract *;
 [XI]JPS60141521  (TERAOKA SHOICHI) [X] 1,12,13 * abstract * [I] 2-11;
 [A]JPH091640  (SEKISUI SEIKEI KOGYO KK) [A] 1,3-5,8-12 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1334817  (SIG KAUTEX GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,5* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027]; figure - *;
 [X]WO2006064057  (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE], et al) [X] 14 * page 5, line 3 - line 17; figure - *;
 [DXI]DE202006013751U  (SAW SONDERANLAGEN UND WERKZEUG [DE]) [DX] 14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0020] , [0021]; figure - * [I] 13
by applicantJPH06141521
 JPH091640
 DE202006013751U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.