Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2164447

EP2164447 - POLYMER-BASED PIGMENT-BEARING INK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.02.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schwan-STABILO Cosmetics GmbH & Co. KG
Schwanweg 1
90562 Heroldsberg / DE
[2010/12]
Inventor(s)01 / BAUER, Barbara
Rothäuslweg 3
84508 Burgkirchen a.d.Alz / DE
02 / HOFMANN, Karin
Am Steinkreuz 2
91207 Lauf / DE
 [2010/12]
Representative(s)Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/12]Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Application number, filing date08749457.114.05.2008
[2010/12]
WO2008EP03874
Priority number, dateDE2007102445425.05.2007         Original published format: DE102007024454
[2010/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008145258
Date:04.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2164447
Date:24.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008
[2010/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/04, A61K8/39, A61K8/44, A61K8/81, A61Q1/10
[2010/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/12]
TitleGerman:PIGMENTHALTIGE TINTE AUF POLYMERBASIS[2010/12]
English:POLYMER-BASED PIGMENT-BEARING INK[2010/12]
French:ENCRE CONTENANT UN PIGMENT À BASE POLYMÈRE[2010/12]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2009National basic fee paid 
28.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/12]
22.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination07.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1872/17
13.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
11.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
31.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1529513  (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006]; example -; claim 1 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0040] *;
 [Y]FR2844192  (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * page 10, line 7 - page 17, line 7; example A; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO0154660  (OREAL [FR]; NORMAN GREG [US]; KANJI MOHAMED [US]) [Y] 1-13 * page 3, paragraph LAST - page 5, paragraph 2; examples 1,2,4; claim - *;
 [Y]EP1077062  (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0041]; examples 2,4,5; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2004223935  (MEUNIER CHRISTINE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043]; tables 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1462084  (MIKUNI COLOR WORKS [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0030]; examples 1-3 *;
 [A]DE20009445U  (SCHWAN STABILO COSMETICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 8, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; examples 2,7-12,21,22 *