Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2140023

EP2140023 - INSECT RESISTANT PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Change - applicantpublished on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[2019/46]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / LINDERS, Enrico Gerardus Albertus
Westeinde 62
NL-1601 Bk Enkhuizen / NL
02 / NICOLET, Jean Louis Marie Edouard
Domaine du Moulin
F-84260 Sarrians / FR
03 / VAN WIJK, Henricus, Johannes
12, chemin de l`Hobit
BP 27
F-31790 Saint-Sauveur / FR
 [2013/19]
Former [2010/01]01 / LINDERS, Enrico Gerardus Albertus
Westeinde 62
NL-1601 Bk Enkhuizen / NL
02 / NICOLET, Jean Louis Marie Edouard
Domaine du Moulin
F-84260 Sarrians / FR
03 / VAN WIJK, Henricus, Johannes
12, chemin de l`Hobit BP 27
F-31790 Saint-Sauveur / FR
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
CHBS-B4.8
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/18]Syngenta International AG
WRO 1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldalle 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2013/44]Schaberg, Ulf Günther , et al
Syngenta International AG
Intellectual Property
WRO-1004-6-22
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2012/41]Bessiere, Philippe Jean Luc , et al
Syngenta International AG
Intellectual Property
WRO-1004-6-22
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2010/01]Bessiere, Philippe Jean Luc , et al
Syngenta Participations AG IP Department Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date08749952.130.04.2008
[2010/01]
WO2008EP55374
Priority number, dateEP2007029055602.05.2007         Original published format: EP 07290556
EP2007011964930.10.2007         Original published format: EP 07119649
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008135510
Date:13.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2140023
Date:06.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008
[2010/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2140023
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, A01H5/00
[2010/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/01]
TitleGerman:INSEKTENRESISTENTE PFLANZEN[2010/01]
English:INSECT RESISTANT PLANT[2010/01]
French:PLANTE RÉSISTANTE AUX INSECTES[2010/01]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase20.10.2009National basic fee paid 
20.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2009Examination requested  [2010/01]
06.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2013Fee for grant paid
22.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.02.2014Observations by third parties
06.02.2014Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP12183382.6  / EP2543741
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.09.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.02.2014   
Erklärung von Bern (Verein)/Swissaid/Niederlande Bionext/Niederlande LTO the Netherlandsir./ Albanien Inst.f.Environm. Policy
Dienerstrasse 12/Lorystrasse 6a/Laan van
Vollenhove 3221/Bezuidenhoutseweg 225
8026 Zürich/3000 Bern 5/3706 AR Zeist/
2594 AL Den Haag / CH
Opponent's representative
Dolder, Fritz
Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558
8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2014/12]
Opponent(s)01  03.02.2014   
Erklärung von Bern (Verein)/Swissaid/Niederlande Bionext/Niederlande LTO the Netherlandsir./ Albanien Inst. for Environmental
Dienerstrasse 12/Lorystrasse 6a/Laan van
Vollenhove 3221/Bezuidenhoutseweg 225
8026 Zürich/3000 Bern 5/3706 AR Zeist/
2594 AL Den Haag / CH
Opponent's representative
Dolder, Fritz
Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558
8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH
18.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.05.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2016
10.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2018Reply to a communication from the opposition division
01.02.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2019
07.03.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE30.04.2014
LU30.04.2014
[2016/16]
Former [2015/21]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
IE30.04.2014
LU30.04.2014
Former [2015/01]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
LU30.04.2014
Former [2014/52]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/52]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SE08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - MARUTHI M N ET AL, "Resistance of tomato and sweet-pepper genotypes to Tomato leaf curl Bangalore virus and its vector Bemisia tabaci.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEST MANAGEMENT, (200310), vol. 49, no. 4, ISSN 0967-0874, pages 297 - 303, XP001538567 [Y] 1-67 * page 302, column R; table 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09670870310001593353
 [Y]  - FERY R L ET AL, "RESISTANCE IN PEPPER CAPSICUM-ANNUUM L. TO WESTERN FLOWER THRIPS FRANKLINELLA-OCCIDENTALIS PERGANDE", HORTSCIENCE, (1991), vol. 26, no. 8, ISSN 0018-5345, pages 1073 - 1074, XP009105678 [Y] 1-67 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MARIS P C ET AL, "Thrips resistance in pepper and its consequences for the acquisition and inoculation of Tomato spotted wilt virus by the western flower thrips.", PHYTOPATHOLOGY, (200301), vol. 93, no. 1, ISSN 0031-949X, pages 96 - 101, XP002495705 [Y] 1-67 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/PHYTO.2003.93.1.96
 [Y]  - THABUIS A ET AL, "Marker-assisted introgression of 4 Phytophthora capsici resistance QTL alleles into a bell pepper line: validation of additive and epistatic effects", MOLECULAR BREEDING, (200408), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 1380-3743, pages 9 - 20, XP009105701 [Y] 1-67 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:MOLB.0000037991.38278.82
 [Y]  - CHAIM ARNON BEN ET AL, "fs3.1: A major fruit shape QTL conserved in Capsicum.", GENOME, (200302), vol. 46, no. 1, ISSN 0831-2796, pages 1 - 9, XP002495708 [Y] 1-67 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/g02-096
 [A]  - NOMBELA GLORIA ET AL, "The root-knot nematode resistance gene Mi-1.2 of tomato is responsible for resistance against the whitefly Bemisia tabaci.", MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS, (200307), vol. 16, no. 7, ISSN 0894-0282, pages 645 - 649, XP009105698 [A] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1094/MPMI.2003.16.7.645
 [A]  - LASKA P ET AL, "RESISTANCE TO THE GLASSHOUSE WHITE FLY TRIALEURODES-VAPORARIORUM IN SWEET PEPPER CAPSICUM-ANNUUM", EUPHYTICA, (1982), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 977 - 980, XP009105697

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00039238