EP2162120 - NANOPARTICLES COMPRISING A NON-IONIZABLE CELLULOSIC POLYMER AND AN AMPHIPHILIC NON-IONIZABLE BLOCK COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bend Research, Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701-8599 / US | [2016/18] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states Bend Research, Inc 64550 Research Road Bend OR 97701-8599 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOOM, Corey, Jay Bend Research, Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | 02 /
CREW, Marshall, David 63536 Old Deschutes Bend, OR 97701 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Warren, Kenyon Bend Research, Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | 04 /
MORGEN, Michael, Mark Bend Research, Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | 05 /
SMITHEY, Daniel, Tod 19009 Innes Market Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/11] | 01 /
BLOOM, Corey, Jay Bend Research, Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | ||
02 /
CREW, Marshall, David 63536 Old Deschutes Bend, OR 97701 / US | |||
03 /
MILLER, Warren, Kenyon Bend Research Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | |||
04 /
MORGEN, Michael, Mark Bend Research, Inc. 64550 Research Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | |||
05 /
SMITHEY, Daniel, Tod 19009 Innes Market Road Bend, OR 97701 / US | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Macchetta, Andrea, et al Capsugel Belgium NV Rijksweg 11 2880 Bornem / BE | ||
Former [2013/44] | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2010/11] | Goodwin, Mark Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08751053.3 | 26.05.2008 | [2010/11] | WO2008IB01352 | Priority number, date | US20070941755P | 04.06.2007 Original published format: US 941755 P | [2010/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008149192 | Date: | 11.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2162120 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2162120 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/51, A61K47/34, A61K47/38, A61K31/42, A61K31/415, A61K31/435 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
A61K9/5138 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/435 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
A61K9/5161 (EP,US);
A61K9/5192 (EP,US);
Y10S977/773 (EP,US);
Y10S977/906 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOPARTIKEL MIT NICHT IONISIERBAREM ZELLULOSEPOLYMER UND AMPHIPILEM NICHT IONISIERBAREM BLOCKCOPOLYMER | [2010/11] | English: | NANOPARTICLES COMPRISING A NON-IONIZABLE CELLULOSIC POLYMER AND AN AMPHIPHILIC NON-IONIZABLE BLOCK COPOLYMER | [2010/11] | French: | NANOPARTICULES COMPORTANT UN POLYMÈRE CELLULOSIQUE NON IONISABLE ET UN COPOLYMÈRE BLOC AMPHIPHILE NON IONISABLE | [2010/11] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2012 | 31.05.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2008 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | IE | 26.05.2016 | LU | 26.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.05.2008 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.05.2008 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.05.2008 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 26.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y] - CELIKKAYA E ET AL, "Rifampicin carrying poly (D,L-lactide)/poly(ethylene glycol) microspheres: loading and release", ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, INC., BOSTON, US, (19960701), vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0160-564X, pages 743 - 751, XP009106825 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * tables 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1525-1594.1996.tb04535.x | [Y] - SHUAI X ET AL, "Micellar carriers based on block copolymers of poly(epsilon-caprolactone) and poly(ethylene glycol) for doxorubicin delivery", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040827), vol. 98, no. 3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 415 - 426, XP004527194 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 417, column RIGHT, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2004.06.003 | [Y] - ALIABADI H M ET AL, "Micelles of methoxy poly(ethylene oxide)-b-poly(@?-caprolactone) as vehicles for the solubilization and controlled delivery of cyclosporine A", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20050518), vol. 104, no. 2, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 301 - 311, XP004903344 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * table 3 * * page 304, column LEFT, line 44 - column RIGHT, line 5 * | [PX] - HSIEH MING-FA ET AL, "Nano-sized micelles of block copolymers of methoxy poly(ethylene glycol)-poly(epsilon-caprolactone)-graft-2-hydroxyethyl cellulose for doxorubicin delivery", JOURNAL OF NANOSCIENCE AND NANOTECHNOLOGY, AMERICAN SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, US, (20080501), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1533-4880, pages 2362 - 2368, XP009106758 [PX] 1-15 * abstract * * introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1166/jnn.2008.322 |