Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2146728

EP2146728 - PROGENITOR CELLS FROM URINE AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.01.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wake Forest University Health Sciences
391 Technology Way, Suite 199
Winston-Salem NC 27101 / US
[2010/04]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Yuanyuan
5121 Caversham Court
Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27106 / US
02 / ATALA, Anthony
345 N. Stratford Road
Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27104 / US
 [2010/11]
Former [2010/04]01 / ZHANG, Yuanyuan
2200 Allen Easley Drive, Apt. 5-J
Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27106 / US
02 / ATALA, Anthony
2661 Reynolds Drive
Winston-Salem, North Carolina 27157 / US
Representative(s)Gibbs, Richard , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/04]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
Application number, filing date08754571.120.05.2008
[2010/04]
WO2008US06438
Priority number, dateUS20070939247P21.05.2007         Original published format: US 939247 P
US20070943215P11.06.2007         Original published format: US 943215 P
[2010/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008153685
Date:18.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2146728
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008
[2010/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.01.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/22, C12N5/08, C12N5/06
[2010/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/04]
TitleGerman:VORLÄUFERZELLEN AUS DEM HARN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG[2010/04]
English:PROGENITOR CELLS FROM URINE AND METHODS FOR USING THE SAME[2010/04]
French:CELLULES PROGÉNITRICES PROVENANT DE L'URINE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR UTILISATION[2010/04]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2009National basic fee paid 
06.11.2009Search fee paid 
06.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/04]
27.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination20.08.2015Appeal received No.  T2162/15
20.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004010852  (KROPP BRADLEY P [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [XI]  - ZHANG YUAN YUAN ET AL, "A novel cell source for urologic tissue reconstruction", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY; AUA ANNUAL MEETING 2007; ANAHEIM, CA, USA; MAY 19 20070521 LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (200704), vol. 177, no. 4 supplement S, ISSN 0022-5347, page 238, XP008129230 [X] 1,6,8 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,7
 [A]  - STAACK A ET AL, "Molecular, cellular and developmental biology of urothelium as a basis of bladder regeneration", DIFFERENTIATION, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, vol. 73, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1111/J.1432-0436.2005.00014.X, ISSN 0301-4681, (20050401), pages 121 - 133, (20050401), XP026772241 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-0436.2005.00014.x
 [A]  - BECKER ET AL, "Stem Cells for Regeneration of Urological Structures", EUROPEAN UROLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20070323), vol. 51, no. 5, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.EURURO.2007.01.029, ISSN 0302-2838, pages 1217 - 1228, XP005934664 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.eururo.2007.01.029
International search[Y]US6548299  (PYKETT MARK J [US], et al);
 [X]US6008008  (JAMES ARTHUR [GB], et al);
 [A]US6235527  (RAO MAHENDRA S [US], et al)
 [Y]  - SAGRINATI C. E TAL., "Isolation and Characterization of Multipotent Progenitor Cells from the Bowman's Capsule of Adult Human Kidneys", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY, (2006), vol. 17, pages 2443 - 2456, XP002454240

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2006010089
 [A]  - KITAMURA S. ET AL., "Establishment and characterization of renal progenitor like cells from S3 segment of nephron in rat adult kidney", THE FASEB JOURNAL, vol. 19, pages 1789 - 1797, XP002471869

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.05-3942com