Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2150993

EP2150993 - LAMP WITH CONTROLLABLE SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.04.2013
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.05.2013  [2013/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/06]For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COK, Ronald Steven
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
02 / KANE, Paul James
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
03 / MILLER, Michael Eugene
343 State Street
Rochester, New York 14650 / US
 [2010/06]
Representative(s)Weber, Etienne Nicolas
Kodak
Boite n 2
Zone d'activité SAONEOR
12 rue Alfred Kastler
71530 Fragnes / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/06]Weber, Etienne Nicolas
Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21
71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date08754634.722.05.2008
[2010/06]
WO2008US06525
Priority number, dateUS2007075505530.05.2007         Original published format: US 755055
[2010/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008150380
Date:11.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2150993
Date:10.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008
[2010/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/00
[2010/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/06]
TitleGerman:LAMPE MIT STEUERBAREM SPEKTRUM[2010/06]
English:LAMP WITH CONTROLLABLE SPECTRUM[2010/06]
French:LAMPE À SPECTRE CONTRÔLABLE[2010/06]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2009National basic fee paid 
19.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.10.2009Examination requested  [2010/06]
04.04.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007001581  (STASIAK JAMES W [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0004] , [0014] , [0032] - [0040] - [0056] , [0070] - [0072]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2005051766  (STOKES EDWARD B [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0017] , [0020] , [0037] , [0043] , [0052] *;
 [Y]US2006043361  (LEE SUNG H [KR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0026] - [0034] - [0054] - [0056] *;
 [Y]US2005092980  (CHEN CHENG C [TW], et al) [Y] 5,10,11 * figures 2,7 *
 [Y]  - DAMILANO B ET AL, "From visible to white light emission by GaN quantum dots on Si(111) substrate", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, (19990816), vol. 75, no. 7, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 962 - 964, XP012024601 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 962, column R, lines 2,3 * * page 964, column R, lines 9-11; figure 4(d) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124567