Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2160286

EP2160286 - METHOD OF USING A FORMABLE CORE BLOCK FOR A RESIN IMPREGNATION PROCESS, METHOD OF FORMING A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE AND COMPOSITE STRUCTURE OBTAINED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/10]METHOD OF USING A FORMABLE CORE BLOCK FOR A RESIN IMPREGNATION PROCESS
[2010/24]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2013/21]
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
LM GLASFIBER A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Inventor(s)01 / MIKKELSEN, Tommy
Gammel Engvej 25
DK-6630 Rødding / DK
02 / STAGE, Morten
Østre Kirkevej 2 A
DK-6630 Rødding / DK
 [2010/10]
Representative(s)Kitchen, Steven Richard , et al
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2018/47]
Former [2013/21]Hussey, Paul Anthony , et al
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Former [2012/08]Kitchen, Steven Richard , et al
LM Wind Power A/S
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
Former [2010/10]Kitchen, Steven Richard
Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33
1780 Copenhagen V / DK
Application number, filing date08758252.427.06.2008
[2010/10]
WO2008DK00243
Priority number, dateDK2007000094529.06.2007         Original published format: DK 200700945
DK2007000094629.06.2007         Original published format: DK 200700946
[2010/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009003476
Date:08.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2160286
Date:10.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009
[2010/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2160286
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2160286
Date:21.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:B29C70/44, B29C70/54
[2010/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/47]
Former [2010/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES FORMBAREN KERNBLOCKS FÜR EINEN HARZIMPRÄGNIERUNGSPROZESS, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER VERBUNDSTRUKTUR UND DANACH HERGESTELLTE VERBUNDSTRUKTUR[2010/25]
English:METHOD OF USING A FORMABLE CORE BLOCK FOR A RESIN IMPREGNATION PROCESS, METHOD OF FORMING A COMPOSITE STRUCTURE AND COMPOSITE STRUCTURE OBTAINED THEREBY[2010/24]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN BLOC D'ÂME APTE AU FORMAGE DANS LE CADRE D'UN PROCESSUS D'IMPRÉGNATION DE RÉSINE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE STRUCTURE EN MATIÈRE COMPOSITE ET STRUCTURE AINSI OBTENUE[2010/24]
Former [2010/10]VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES FORMBAREN KERNBLOCKS FÜR EINEN HARZIMPRÄGNIERUNGSPROZESS
Former [2010/10]METHOD OF USING A FORMABLE CORE BLOCK FOR A RESIN IMPREGNATION PROCESS
Former [2010/10]PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN BLOC D'ÂME APTE AU FORMAGE DANS LE CADRE D'UN PROCESSUS D'IMPRÉGNATION DE RÉSINE
Entry into regional phase14.12.2009National basic fee paid 
14.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/10]
12.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2010Fee for grant paid
09.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.09.2011  06.10.2011  WITHDRAWN
GE Wind Energy GmbH
Holsterfeld 16
48499 Salzbergen / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 [2017/43]
Former [2011/45]
Opponent(s)01  28.09.2011  06.10.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GE Wind Energy GmbH
Holsterfeld 16
48499 Salzbergen / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
08.11.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
30.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
21.05.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.05.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
04.10.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
07.12.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.06.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
09.10.2018Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition12.07.2013Appeal received No.  T1589/13
26.09.2013Statement of grounds filed
04.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
04.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
HU29.12.2010
IT29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
IE27.06.2011
LU27.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
IT29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
IE27.06.2011
LU27.06.2011
FR30.06.2011
MC30.06.2011
CH30.06.2012
LI30.06.2012
Former [2011/38]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/37]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/36]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/35]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/34]AT29.12.2010
BE29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/29]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0517416  (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1162058  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0114]; figure 20 *;
 [DA]EP1304211  (SCRIMP SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [DA] 1-15 * paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *
OppositionEP0517416
 FR1582581
 US4622091
    - "Vacuum Infusing Processing with DIAB core materials", DIAB Technical Bulletin, pp. 1 to 17, Rev. C, February 19, 2002, DIAB Technologies, Texas, USA
    - "Standard Finishing", DIAB Technical Bulletin, pp. 1 to 5, September 10, 2001, DIAB Technologies, Texas, USA
    - "Standard Finishing", DIAB product information, 2006