Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2152745

EP2152745 - IMMUNOGLOBULIN PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstraße 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FALKENSTEIN, Roberto
Wastl-Witt-Strasse 5
80689 München / DE
02 / GIESSEL, Claudia
Merzstrasse 9
83646 Bad Tölz / DE
 [2014/01]
Former [2013/35]01 / FALKENSTEIN, Roberto
Wastl-Witt-Strasse 5
80689 München / DE
02 / GIESSEL, Claudia
Buchener Strasse 25
83646 Bad Tölz / DE
Former [2010/07]01 / FALKENSTEIN, Roberto
Wastl-Witt-Strasse 5
80689 Muenchen / DE
02 / GIESSEL, Claudia
Buchener Strasse 25
83646 Bad Toelz / DE
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Burger, Alexander
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (TR-E) Postfach 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Former [2010/07]Burger, Alexander
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (TR-E) Postfach 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date08758815.828.05.2008
[2010/07]
WO2008EP04231
Priority number, dateEP2007001084001.06.2007         Original published format: EP 07010840
[2010/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008145351
Date:04.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2152745
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008
[2010/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2152745
Date:08.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/00, C07K16/24, C07K16/32
[2013/32]
Former International [2010/07]C07K16/00, C07K1/16, C07K1/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/07]
TitleGerman:IMMUNGLOBULINREINIGUNG[2010/07]
English:IMMUNOGLOBULIN PURIFICATION[2010/07]
French:PURIFICATION D'UNE IMMUNOGLOBULINE[2010/07]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2010National basic fee paid 
04.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/07]
22.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.12.2012
19.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
10.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2013Fee for grant paid
26.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.10.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Steglich, Gregor
Lindwurmstrasse 97a
80337 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
 02  08.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson, et al
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  08.10.2014  14.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Baxter Innovations GmbH
Industriestrasse 67
1221 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Steglich, Gregor
Lindwurmstrasse 97a
80337 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
 02  08.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Potter Clarkson LLP, et al
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  08.10.2014  14.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Baxter Innovations GmbH
Industriestrasse 67
1221 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/47]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Steglich, Gregor
Lindwurmstrasse 97a
80337 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
 02  08.10.2014  13.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 03  08.10.2014  14.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Baxter Innovations GmbH
Industriestrasse 67
1221 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/46]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2014   
Steglich, Gregor
Lindwurmstrasse 97a
80337 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
 02  08.10.2014   
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bassett, Richard Simon, et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
13.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
22.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition03.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1077/17
04.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.05.2012Request for further processing filed
16.05.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.05.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.05.2008
AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE28.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/28]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE28.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
Former [2016/25]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE28.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
Former [2016/16]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE28.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
Former [2015/24]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE28.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE28.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU28.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT08.01.2014
BE08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/39]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006096489  (PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * examples 4-6; claim - *;
 [X]US2006194953  (BONNERJEA JULIAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,12 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] *;
 [X]JPH07155194  ;
 [X]  - "Purification of proteins esp. monoclonal antibodies - by using cation exchange resin, affinity chromatography, and anion exchange resin, with specified pH and concn. of eluate", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 33, Database accession no. 1995-250742, XP002283061 & JPH07155194 A 19950620 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - FISCHER-FRÜHHOLZ S. ET AL, "Applications Sartobind Membrane Adsorbers", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20070502), URL: http://www.sartorius.de/en/biotechnology/laboratory/products_applications/membrane_adsorbers/literature/pdfs/Sartobind_applications_overview.pdf, (20070905), XP002449752 [X] 1,2,9,10 * page 30 *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "PROTEIN FRACTIONATION (COMPLEXITY REDUCTION): 2.2.2.2Mustang Ion Exchange Membrane", PALL LIFE SCIENCES, (20051105), URL: http://www.pall.com/pdf/2.2.2.2_Mustang_Ion_Exchange.pdf, (20070905), XP002449753 [A] 9,10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KNUDSEN H L ET AL, "Membrane ion-exchange chromatography for process-scale antibody purification", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010112), vol. 907, no. 1-2, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 145 - 154, XP004228067 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)01041-4
ExaminationWO2006024497
    - Anonymous, "The practical task of monoclonal IgG purification with CHT ceramic hydroxyapatite", (20060501), URL: http://www.validated.com/revalbio/pdffiles/Waterside_2006.pdf, (20101125), XP007915978
    - FAHRNER R L ET AL, "INDUSTRIAL PURIFICATION OF PHARMACEUTICAL ANTIBODIES: DEVELOPMENT, OPERATION, AND VALIDATION OF CHROMATOGRAPHY PROCESSES", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND GENETIC ENGINEERING REVIEWS, INTERCEPT LTD., ANDOVER, GB, (20010701), vol. 18, ISSN 0264-8725, pages 301 - 327, XP008034714

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02648725.2001.10648017
    - TAKAHASHI SHORI ET AL, "Cationic charge-preferential IgG reabsorption in the renal proximal tubules", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (200410), vol. 66, no. 4, ISSN 0085-2538, pages 1556 - 1560
by applicantWO8905157
 WO9400561
 WO2004024866
 WO2004076485
 EP0530447
 US4983722
 WO9516037
 EP1084136
 US5429746
 US4604208
 WO03040166
 US6716598
 US2006194953
 WO2006096489
 JPH07155194
 WO2006024497
 WO2006125599
 WO2006072564
 US5677171
    - VIJAYALAKSHMI, M.A., APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECH., (1998), vol. 75, pages 93 - 102
    - NECINA, R. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1998), vol. 60, pages 689 - 698
    - DANIELSSON, A. ET AL., J. IMMUN. METH., (1988), vol. 115, pages 79 - 88
    - MHATRE, R. ET AL., J. CHROM. A, (1995), vol. 707, pages 225 - 231
    - SCHWARZ, A. ET AL., LABORPRAXIS, (1997), vol. 21, pages 62 - 66
    - KNUDSEN, H.L. ET AL., J. CHROM. A, (2001), vol. 907, pages 145 - 154
    - BIOTECHNOL. GEN. ENG. REV., (2001), vol. 18, pages 301 - 327
    - HUSTON, J.S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - BIRD, R. E. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUNKAPILLER, T.; HOOD, L., NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, pages 15 - 16
    - AUSUBEL, F. M., ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC.