Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2155392

EP2155392 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYST FOR THE SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION OF ACETYLENIC HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/08]CATALYST FOR THE SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION OF ACETYLENIC HYDROCARBONS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID CATALYST
[2013/44]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.08.2014  [2014/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Süd-Chemie IP GmbH & Co. KG
Lenbachplatz 6
80333 München / DE
[2012/33]
Former [2010/08]For all designated states
Süd-Chemie AG
Lenbachplatz 6
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / UNGAR, Sybille
Zwelbrückenstrasse 13
80331 München / DE
02 / FISCHER, Richard
Sonnenstr. 42
83043 Bad Aibling / DE
03 / TRAUTWEIN, Andreas
Heimatweg 40
83052 Bruckmühl / DE
04 / BLANKENSHIP, Steve
621 South Woodland Drive
Radcliff, KY 40160 / US
05 / BOYER, Jennifer
10012 Harrods Creek Drive
Prospect, NY 40059 / US
06 / URBANCIC, Michael
3228 Broeck Pointe Cir.
Louisville, KY 40241 / US
07 / ROKICKI, Andrzej
3 Bridle Ct.
Mountain Lakes, NJ 07046 / US
 [2010/20]
Former [2010/08]01 / UNGAR, Sybille
Auerfeldstr. 27
81541 München / DE
02 / FISCHER, Richard
Sonnenstr. 42
83043 Bad Aibling / DE
03 / TRAUTWEIN, Andreas
Heimatweg 40
83052 Bruckmühl / DE
04 / BLANKENSHIP, Steve
621 South Woodland Drive
Radcliff, KY 40160 / US
05 / BOYER, Jennifer
10012 Harrods Creek Drive
Prospect, NY 40059 / US
06 / URBANCIC, Michael
3228 Broeck Pointe Cir.
Louisville, KY 40241 / US
07 / ROKICKI, Andrzej
3 Bridle Ct.
Mountain Lakes, NJ 07046 / US
Representative(s)Stolmár, Matthias
Stolmár Scheele & Partner
Patentanwälte
Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/08]Stolmár, Matthias
Stolmár Scheele & Partner Patentanwälte Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date08758898.430.05.2008
[2010/08]
WO2008EP04327
Priority number, dateDE2007102531531.05.2007         Original published format: DE102007025315
[2010/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008145387
Date:04.12.2008
Language:DE
[2008/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2155392
Date:24.02.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008
[2010/08]
Search report(s)International search reportEP12.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:B01J37/02, B01J23/44, B01J23/50, B01J23/48, B01J23/40, B01J23/74, B01J35/00, C07C7/167, C10G45/40
[2010/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/08]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS ZUR SELEKTIVEN HYDRIERUNG ACETYLENISCHER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE[2013/44]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CATALYST FOR THE SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION OF ACETYLENIC HYDROCARBONS[2013/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CATALYSEUR D'HYDROGÉNATION SÉLECTIVE D'HYDROCARBURES ACÉTYLÉNIQUES[2013/44]
Former [2010/08]KATALYSATOR ZUR SELEKTIVEN HYDRIERUNG ACETYLENISCHER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG
Former [2010/08]CATALYST FOR THE SELECTIVE HYDROGENATION OF ACETYLENIC HYDROCARBONS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID CATALYST
Former [2010/08]CATALYSEUR D'HYDROGÉNATION SÉLECTIVE D'HYDROCARBURES ACÉTYLÉNIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ
Entry into regional phase23.12.2009National basic fee paid 
23.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/08]
18.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2013
26.09.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/35]
07.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2006045606  (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 4, lines 7-17 * * page 5, lines 10-19 * * page 6, line 14 - page 9, line 12 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 18 *;
 [X]US6492299  (COUVES JOHN WILLIAM [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 51-59 * * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 13 *;
 [X]EP1452230  (UNIV SHIZUOKA [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0036] , [0038] *;
 [X]GB1283737  (NAT DISTILLERS CHEM CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 61 - page 2, line 46 * * page 2, lines 70-117 * * page 3, lines 25-48 * * examples 1,4 *;
 [X]DE4443705  (STUDIENGESELLSCHAFT KOHLE MBH [DE]) [X] 16-26 * abstract * * page 2, lines 3-10 * * page 2, line 67 - page 3, line 19 * * page 5, lines 51-64 *;
 [A]EP0899013  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] - [0014] - [0016] - [0018] *