Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2152308

EP2152308 - NEW INDICATIONS FOR ANTI- IL-I-BETA THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.05.2019  [2019/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2010/07]
Inventor(s)01 / GRAM, Hermann
Am Bischofsacker 20
79576 Weil Am Rhein / DE
02 / JUNG, Thomas
Leegasse 5/12
A-1140 Wien / AT
 [2010/07]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP , et al
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]Masselink, Johannes Hendrikus Bernardus , et al
Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date08760116.728.05.2008
[2010/07]
WO2008EP56520
Priority number, dateEP2007010908429.05.2007         Original published format: EP 07109084
[2010/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008145664
Date:04.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2152308
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008
[2010/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/24, A61P37/06, C07K14/545
[2010/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/07]
TitleGerman:NEUE ANZEIGEN FÜR EINE ANTI-IL-I-BETA-THERAPIE[2010/07]
English:NEW INDICATIONS FOR ANTI- IL-I-BETA THERAPY[2010/07]
French:NOUVELLES INDICATIONS POUR UNE THÉRAPIE ANTI-IL-I-BÊTA[2010/07]
Entry into regional phase29.12.2009National basic fee paid 
29.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
29.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/07]
17.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
24.10.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.01.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/18]
09.02.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/18]
Appeal following examination07.03.2013Appeal received No.  T1317/13
08.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
09.02.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
09.02.2018Date of oral proceedings
20.02.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP12158373.6  / EP2468301
EP12158424.7  / EP2468302
EP18177247.6  / EP3406263
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.02.2012Request for further processing filed
29.02.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.03.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007050607  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-9 * sequences 1,2 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-9 * * page 14, line 29 - line 34 *;
 [X]WO2005082070  (BAYLOR RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * example 2 *;
 [A]WO2007042524  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] * claims 1-18 *;
 [A]WO2005000215  (UNIV COLORADO REGENTS [US], et al) [A] * examples 1-17 *
 [X]  - HOFFMAN ET AL, "The First Placebo-Controlled Trial in Cryopyrin-Associated Periodic Syndromes (CAPS): IL-1 Trap (rilonacept) Markedly Reduces Clinical and Laboratory Abnormalities in Patients with Familial Cold Autoinflammatory Syndrome (FCAS) and Muckle-Wells Syndrome (MWS)", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY - YEARLY BOOK, INC, US, (200702), vol. 119, no. 2, ISSN 0091-6749, page 524, XP005874020 [X] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2006.12.631
 [A]  - SO ALEXANDER ET AL, "A pilot study of IL-1 inhibition by anakinra in acute gout", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH AND THERAPY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20070312), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1478-6354, page R28, XP021026972 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar2143