Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2152308 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2152308



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 572
10.05.2019 Payment submission rejected Search / examination 1
03.04.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.03.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
26.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.02.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
20.02.2018 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
15.01.2018 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 2
15.01.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
09.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 12
09.01.2018 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.01.2018 Change of representative of the proprietor Appeal 1
09.01.2018 Claims Appeal 3
09.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 35
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.01.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.01.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.12.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.11.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.11.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
17.11.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.07.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.08.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
09.09.2013 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
11.07.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.06.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.06.2013 Outgoing annexe(s) - Board of Appeal Appeal 3
31.05.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
08.05.2013 Claims Appeal 2
08.05.2013 Claims Appeal 2
08.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
08.05.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
08.05.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
08.05.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
08.05.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
08.05.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
11.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
07.03.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.01.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.01.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.01.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
03.01.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.01.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
03.01.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 7
03.01.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
24.10.2012 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
24.10.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
24.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.10.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.10.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.10.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
01.10.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
01.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.10.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 27
01.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
01.10.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
01.10.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
21.09.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
21.09.2012 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.09.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
11.09.2012 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.09.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
07.09.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
07.09.2012 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
13.07.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
09.07.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
29.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
29.06.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.06.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 3
16.03.2012 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
01.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
01.03.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
29.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
29.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.02.2012 Request for further processing Search / examination 3
11.01.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
26.09.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.09.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.07.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.05.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
24.05.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
17.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.02.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
16.02.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.10.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
12.10.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
12.10.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
12.10.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
09.09.2010 Non-scannable object Search / examination 6
09.09.2010 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.09.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
06.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
06.09.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.07.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
09.03.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.02.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.02.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
20.01.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.01.2010 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.12.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
10.11.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.11.2009 General authorisation Search / examination 2
10.11.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
09.10.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.12.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
04.12.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
04.12.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
28.05.2008 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
28.05.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
28.05.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
28.05.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 20
28.05.2008 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 2
28.05.2008 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 24