Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2162918

EP2162918 - PHOTODETECTOR FOR IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Detection Technology OY
Micropolis
91100 Ii / FI
[2010/11]
Inventor(s)01 / JI, Fan
Nymaninkuja 8 F
FIN-02430 Kirkkonummi / FI
02 / JUNTUNEN, Mikko
Susitie 20
FIN-02400 Kirkkonummi / FI
03 / HIETANEN, Iiro
Langnasintie 14
FIN-07780 Harkapaa / FI
 [2010/11]
Representative(s)Williams, David John
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London
WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Williams, David John
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London
WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2010/11]Williams, David John
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London
WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date08760513.504.06.2008
[2010/11]
WO2008EP56933
Priority number, dateGB2007001062904.06.2007         Original published format: GB 0710629
[2010/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008148815
Date:11.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2162918
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008
[2010/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2162918
Date:12.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/146
[2010/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/33]
Former [2010/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:FOTODETEKTOR FÜR EIN BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM[2010/11]
English:PHOTODETECTOR FOR IMAGING SYSTEM[2010/11]
French:PHOTODETECTEUR POUR SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE[2010/11]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2010National basic fee paid 
04.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/11]
08.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2012Fee for grant paid
20.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.06.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.06.2013  17.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Frost, Alex John
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London
WC1X 8BT / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2013/30]
Opponent(s)01  11.06.2013  17.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Frost, Alex John
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London
WC1X 8BT / GB
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
19.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.01.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0537/15
15.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
27.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201003   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2010
30.06.201205   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.06.2008
AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
MT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE04.06.2013
LU04.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
MT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
TR12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE04.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
Former [2015/13]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
MT12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE04.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
Former [2014/24]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE04.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
FR01.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
IE04.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/08]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
MC12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
IT12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
DK12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
BG12.12.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT12.09.2012
BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/28]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
PT14.01.2013
Former [2013/23]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
PL12.09.2012
RO12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
SK12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/22]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
CZ12.09.2012
EE12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
NL12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
ES23.12.2012
IS12.01.2013
Former [2013/20]BE12.09.2012
CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/12]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SE12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/11]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
LV12.09.2012
SI12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
GR13.12.2012
Former [2013/10]CY12.09.2012
FI12.09.2012
HR12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
Former [2013/09]FI12.09.2012
LT12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
Former [2013/08]LT12.09.2012
NO12.12.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2006046471  (KIRBY KYLE K [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,19 * paragraphs [0034] - [0059]; figures 1a-3,5a-9,12 * [Y] 4,6-9,11-18,20-26;
 [XY]WO2004012274  (DETECTION TECHNOLOGY OY [FI]; HIETANEN IIRO [FI]) [X] 27-63 * page 6, line 25 - page 13, line 20; figures 1,5-18 * [Y] 4,6-9,11-18,20-26;
 [XA]US2006231961  (SHIBAYAMA KATSUMI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraphs [0029] - [0077] - [0087]; figures 1,4a-7b * [A] 2,3,6-26;
 [X]EP1589581  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [X] 27-63 * paragraphs [0026] - [0069]; figures 1,5a-8b *;
 [A]US2005098855  (SHIMOJI NORIYUKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6265308  (BRONNER GARY B [US] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *