Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2157978

EP2157978 - MC-1 R, MC-2 R, AND MU OPIOID RECEPTORS MODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.2013  [2013/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Beauty Care Solutions France SAS
32, rue Saint-Jean-de-Dieu
69007 Lyon / FR
[2010/09]
Inventor(s)01 / PAIN, Sabine
Montée du gravier Rouge
38200 Vienne / FR
02 / DEZUTTER, Colette
6 chemin des Sylphides
F-38200 Vienne / FR
03 / ANDRE, Valérie
15 rue de Montlys
F-69420 Ampuis / FR
04 / REYMERMIER, Corinne
48 chemin du Béard
F-69390 Charly / FR
05 / ORLY, Isabelle
8 rue Delbourg
F-69540 Irigny / FR
06 / PERRIER, Eric
Chemin des Lauriers
F-38138 Les Cotes D'arey / FR
 [2010/24]
Former [2010/09]01 / PAIN, Sabine
37 boulevard Jean XXIII
F-69008 Lyon / FR
02 / DEZUTTER, Colette
6 chemin des Sylphides
F-38200 Vienne / FR
03 / ANDRE, Valérie
15 rue de Montlys
F-69420 Ampuis / FR
04 / REYMERMIER, Corinne
48 chemin du Béard
F-69390 Charly / FR
05 / ORLY, Isabelle
8 rue Delbourg
F-69540 Irigny / FR
06 / PERRIER, Eric
Chemin des Lauriers
F-38138 Les Cotes D'arey / FR
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2010/09]Dorff, Gernot Peter Roderich , et al
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date08760699.206.06.2008
[2010/09]
WO2008EP57130
Priority number, dateFR2007005552906.06.2007         Original published format: FR 0755529
[2010/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008148892
Date:11.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2157978
Date:03.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008
[2010/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/14, A61K8/97, A61Q19/08, A61P17/00, A61K31/437
[2010/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/09]
TitleGerman:MC-1R-, MC-2R- UND/ODER MU OPIOID-REZEPTOR-MODULATION[2010/09]
English:MC-1 R, MC-2 R, AND MU OPIOID RECEPTORS MODULATION[2010/09]
French:MODULATION DE MC-1R, MC-2R ET DES RÉCEPTEURS MU OPIOÏDES[2010/09]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2010National basic fee paid 
07.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/09]
26.02.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.07.2010Observations by third parties
10.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/16]
27.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/16]
Divisional application(s)EP12189355.6  / EP2574332
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003228658  (SHU YOUMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0126] , [0127] , [0130] , [0131] *;
 [X]US2003110518  (HOUSEKNECHT KAREN L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0186] , [0226] , [0229] , [0233] *;
 [X]WO9747316  (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-5,10,13-15 * page 40 - page 42 *;
 [X]  - BORDE NATHALIE ET AL, "Effects of methyl beta-carboline-3-carboxylate on memory impairments induced by chronic alcohol consumption in mice", PROGRESS IN NEURO-PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY AND BIOLOGICAL PSYCHIATRY, (1996), vol. 20, no. 8, ISSN 0278-5846, pages 1377 - 1387, XP002495557 [X] 1,2,4,6,11,13,14 * page 1379 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0278-5846(96)00133-9
 [X]  - OAKLEY N R ET AL, "DIFFERENTIAL PHARMACOLOGICAL EFFECTS OF BETA CARBOLINE-3-CARBOXYLIC-ACID ESTERS", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (1982), vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 0028-3908, pages 587 - 590, XP002495558 [X] 1,2,4,6,11,13,14 * page 587 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(82)90052-1
 [A]  - TSATMALI MARINA ET AL, "Skin POMC peptides: Their actions at the human MC-1 receptor and roles in the tanning response", PIGMENT CELL RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 13, no. Supplement 8, ISSN 0893-5785, pages 125 - 129, XP009095072 [A] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HIROBE TOMOHISA ET AL, "The melanocortin receptor-1 gene but not the proopiomelanocortin gene is expressed in melanoblasts and contributes their differentiation in the mouse skin", PIGMENT CELL RESEARCH, (200412), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0893-5785, pages 627 - 635, XP002466465 [A] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0749.2004.00179.x
other   - "Nuskha-e-Zimaad", TKDL, Database accession no. AA20/21A, XP003027373
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-haawi-fil-Tibb, (1967), vol. XX, page 21
    - "Dalook-e-Abhal", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/62F, XP003027374
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 123
    - "Natool", TKDL, Database accession no. AA20/230A27A, XP003027375
    - ABU BAKR MOHAMMAD BIN ZAKARIYYA AL-RAZI, Kitaab-al-Haawi-fil-Tibb, (1967), page 207
    - "Tila-e-harmal", TKDL, Database accession no. Ma2/193, XP003027376
    - AMINUDDAULAH ABUL FARJ IBN AL-QUFF MASEEHI, Kitaab-al-'Umdah-fil-Jeraahat, (1937), vol. II, page 51
    - "Zimaad-e-samagh-e-aaloo Baloo", TKDL, Database accession no. MH3/40D1, XP003027377
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1896), vol. I, page 110
    - "Zimaad-e-kharbaq Siyah Barae Kalf Va Namash", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/482G, XP003027378
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. II, page 494
    - "Ubtan Muhsin-e-laun", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/139, XP003027379
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), vol. 2ND, page 34