Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2158096

EP2158096 - PRE-IMPREGNATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
28.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schoeller Technocell GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
49086 Osnabrück / DE
[2012/21]
Former [2010/09]For all designated states
Technocell Dekor GmbH & Co. KG
Burg Gretesch
49086 Osnabrück / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WICHER, Martina
Mindener Str. 50a
49143 Bissendorf / DE
02 / STANDKE, Mirko
Olbrichtstrasse 2
04157 Leipzig / DE
 [2010/14]
Former [2010/09]01 / WICHER, Martina
Mindener Str. 50a
49143 Bissendorf / DE
02 / STANDKE, Mirko
In den Dieken 4
49163 Bohmte / DE
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2010/09]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date08761274.320.06.2008
[2010/09]
WO2008EP57870
Priority number, dateDE2007103010228.06.2007         Original published format: DE102007030102
[2010/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009000769
Date:31.12.2008
Language:DE
[2009/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2158096
Date:03.03.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008
[2010/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2158096
Date:08.02.2012
Language:DE
[2012/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:B44C5/04, D21H17/28, D21H17/35, D21H17/37, D21H17/67, D21H19/58, D21H27/26
[2010/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/09]
TitleGerman:VORIMPRÄGNAT[2010/09]
English:PRE-IMPREGNATED PRODUCT[2010/09]
French:PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ[2010/09]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2009National basic fee paid 
10.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/09]
11.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2011Fee for grant paid
28.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Munksjö Dettingen GmbH
Schwalbenstadt 1
72581 Dettingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
 02  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
 03  07.11.2012  07.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kämmerer Paper GmbH
Römereschstraße 33
49090 Osnabrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
 [2017/20]
Former [2016/10]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Munksjö Dettingen GmbH
Schwalbenstadt 1
72581 Dettingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
 02  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
 03  07.11.2012  07.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Ahlstrom Osnabrück GmbH
Römereschstrasse 33
49090 Osnabrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
Former [2015/51]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Munksjö Dettingen GmbH
Schwalbenstadt 1
72581 Dettingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
 02  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bianchetti, Giuseppe
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
I-20129 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
 03  07.11.2012  07.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Ahlstrom Osnabrück GmbH
Römereschstrasse 33
49090 Osnabrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
Former [2014/02]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Munksjö Dettingen GmbH
Schwalbenstadt 1
72581 Dettingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
 02  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bianchetti, Giuseppe
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
I-20129 Milano / IT
 03  07.11.2012  07.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Ahlstrom Osnabrück GmbH
Römereschstrasse 33
49090 Osnabrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
Former [2012/51]
Opponent(s)01  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Munksjö Dettingen GmbH
Schwalbenstadt 1
72581 Dettingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
 02  07.11.2012  13.11.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Bianchetti, Giuseppe
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
I-20129 Milano / IT
 03  07.11.2012   
Ahlstrom Osnabrück GmbH
Römereschstrasse 33
49090 Osnabrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Sendrowski, Heiko
Lausitzer Strasse 4
67065 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
13.12.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
29.10.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.10.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition22.12.2014Appeal received No.  T2170/14
09.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2014Appeal received No.  T2170/14
04.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
05.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.06.2008
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
LU20.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
LU20.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/35]CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2013/33]CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/50]CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/49]CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/48]CY08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/47]CY08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IE08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1176255  (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1,2,11 * paragraph [0034]; tables 3-5 *;
 [X]WO2007000420  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 12; claim - *;
 [A]EP0806522  (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19728250
 EP0648248
 EP0739435
 EP1176255
 WO2007000420
 EP0648248
 EP0739435
 WO0111139