Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2161004

EP2161004 - INTRAOCULAR LENS INSERTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOYA CORPORATION
7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8525 / JP
[2010/10]
Inventor(s)01 / ICHINOHE, Takashi
c/o HOYA CORPORATION
7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8525 / JP
02 / SOMEYA, Kenji
c/o HOYA CORPORATION
7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8525 / JP
03 / KUDOH, Kazunori
c/o HOYA CORPORATION
7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8525 / JP
 [2017/52]
Former [2010/10]01 / ICHINOHE, Takashi
c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8525 / JP
02 / SOMEYA, Kenji
c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8525 / JP
03 / KUDOH, Kazunori
c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 161-8525 / JP
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2017/52]
Former [2010/10]MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08764913.330.05.2008
[2010/10]
WO2008JP59995
Priority number, dateJP2007014426330.05.2007         Original published format: JP 2007144263
[2010/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008149794
Date:11.12.2008
Language:JA
[2008/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2161004
Date:10.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2161004
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/16
[2010/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/52]
Former [2010/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:INSTRUMENT ZUM EINSETZEN EINER INTRAOKULARLINSE[2010/10]
English:INTRAOCULAR LENS INSERTING TOOL[2010/10]
French:OUTIL UTILISÉ POUR L'INSERTION D'UNE LENTILLE INTRAOCULAIRE[2010/10]
Entry into regional phase29.12.2009Translation filed 
30.12.2009National basic fee paid 
30.12.2009Search fee paid 
30.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
30.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/24]
22.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2017Fee for grant paid
17.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.11.2016
Opposition(s)28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
02.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE30.05.2018
LU30.05.2018
MT30.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/24]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE30.05.2018
LU30.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/19]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE30.05.2018
LU30.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
LU30.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/39]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
IT27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
ES27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
NL27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/21]FI27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2007037223  (HOYA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * See document below filed in one of the official languages of the EPO. * [I] 2;
 EP1941846  [ ] (HOYA CORP [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0035] - [0066]; figures 1A-4C *;
 [A]WO0139701  (PHARMACIA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 22, line 7 - page 23, line 2; figures 1A-1D *;
 [A]US4934363  (SMITH GREGORY M [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 10 - column 7, line 23; figures 1-6 *
International search[A]US5275604  (RHEINISH ROBERT S [US], et al);
 [A]JP2000516488