Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2154903

EP2154903 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE STATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2016
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[2015/20]
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Shohei
c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / KATO, Yasuyuki
c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
 [2015/11]
Former [2010/07]01 / YAMADA, Shohei
c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
02 / KATO, Yasuyuki
c/o Sharp kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2015/20]
Former [2010/07]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date08764997.603.06.2008
[2010/07]
WO2008JP60184
Priority number, dateJP2007015099206.06.2007         Original published format: JP 2007150992
JP2008002155731.01.2008         Original published format: JP 2008021557
[2010/07]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008149849
Date:11.12.2008
Language:JA
[2008/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2154903
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2154903
Date:13.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/08, H04J11/00, H04W74/00, // H04W56/00, H04W72/04
[2015/09]
Former International [2010/27]H04W74/08, H04J11/00, H04W4/00, // H04W56/00
Former International [2010/08]H04W84/00, H04J11/00, H04W4/00
Former International [2010/07]H04Q7/20, H04J11/00, H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/20]
Former [2010/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MOBILES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM SOWIE BASISSTATION UND MOBILSTATION DAFÜR[2010/07]
English:MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND MOBILE STATION DEVICE[2010/07]
French:SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE ET DISPOSITIF DE STATION MOBILE[2010/07]
Entry into regional phase24.09.2009Translation filed 
24.09.2009National basic fee paid 
24.09.2009Search fee paid 
24.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.2009Examination requested  [2010/07]
22.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2015Fee for grant paid
01.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13004450.6  / EP2685778
EP15001298.7  / EP2953416
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2011
Opposition(s)16.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.06.2008
AT13.05.2015
BE13.05.2015
CY13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
MT13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SE13.05.2015
SI13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
TR13.05.2015
IE03.06.2015
LU03.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
[2018/02]
Former [2017/39]HU03.06.2008
AT13.05.2015
BE13.05.2015
CY13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
MT13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SE13.05.2015
SI13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
TR13.05.2015
IE03.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2017/03]AT13.05.2015
BE13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
MT13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SI13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
IE03.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/37]AT13.05.2015
BE13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SI13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
IE03.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/24]AT13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SI13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
IE03.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/22]AT13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
IE03.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/20]AT13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
IE03.06.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/13]AT13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
MC13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/10]AT13.05.2015
CZ13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
PL13.05.2015
RO13.05.2015
SK13.05.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
EE13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/08]AT13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
IT13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT13.05.2015
DK13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT13.05.2015
ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
BG13.08.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
IS13.09.2015
PT14.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES13.05.2015
FI13.05.2015
HR13.05.2015
LT13.05.2015
LV13.05.2015
NO13.08.2015
GR14.08.2015
PT14.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[I]  - NSN, 3GPP DRAFT; R2-071712 STAGE 2 UPDATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070504), vol. RAN WG2, no. Kobe, Japan; 20070504, XP050134631 [I] 1-3 * Sections 10.1, 10.1.5, 10.1.5.1 and 10.1.5.2 * * figures 10.1.5.2-1 *
 [A]  - 3GPP SUPPORT TEAM, 3GPP DRAFT; R2-072131, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070504), vol. RAN WG2, no. Kobe, Japan; 20070504, XP050134990 [A] 1-3 * page 18 *
 [A]  - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Uplink synchronization", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-070781, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070209), vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Louis, USA; 20070209, XP050133807 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
 [A]  - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Contention-based and Contention-free Access Procedures in LTE", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-071299ACCESSPROCEDURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070322), vol. RAN WG2, no. St. Julian; 20070322, XP050134254 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *
International search[A]JP2003163962  ;
 [A]JP2007006080  ;
 [A]WO2007052811