Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2154903 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2154903



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 419
18.03.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
13.05.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.02.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.02.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.02.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 58
05.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
16.01.2015 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.12.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
11.12.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.10.2013 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
17.07.2013 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
19.10.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
29.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.06.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.06.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
24.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
24.02.2012 Claims Search / examination 1
24.02.2012 Description Search / examination 1
24.02.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.10.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
21.10.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.12.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
22.12.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
22.12.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
22.12.2010 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
22.06.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 6
04.06.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
04.02.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
04.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
04.02.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
20.01.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
14.01.2010 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
23.12.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
23.12.2009 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
07.10.2009 The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2009 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
24.09.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.09.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
24.09.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.09.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
24.09.2009 Description Search / examination 44
24.09.2009 Drawings Search / examination 20
24.09.2009 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Search / examination 1
24.09.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 9
06.01.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 53
06.01.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
11.12.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.12.2008 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
11.12.2008 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 65