Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2152281

EP2152281 - COSMETIC USE OF GINSENG BERRY EXTRACT FOR SKIN WHITENING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/07]COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIC HEART DISEASE, FACILITATION OF BLOOD CIRCULATION AND ANGIOGENESIS, IMPROVING SKIN BEAUTY, IMPROVING MALE SEXUAL FUNCTION CONTAINING GINSENG BERRY EXTRACT
[2015/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amorepacific Corporation
181, Hangang-ro 2-ga
Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-777 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/37]For all designated states
Amorepacific Corporation
181, Hangang-ro 2-ga
Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-777 / KR
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Amorepacific Corporation
181, 2-ga Hangang-ro Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-777 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Chan-Woong
104, 314-1 Bora-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-904 / KR
02 / YEOM, Myeong Hoon
104-1101 Byoksan 1-danji
Jukjeon 2-dong
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-162 / KR
03 / CHO, Nam Hoon
306-1003 Sinwon Apt.
Gumi-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-500 / KR
04 / LEE, Sang Jun
205-702 Hansol LG
Jeongja-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-010 / KR
05 / LEE, Sang Min
106, 314-1 Bora-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-904 / KR
06 / LEE, Jin Young
434-802 Kotme-maeul Hyundai Hometown
Jukjeon-dong
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-160 / KR
07 / JEON, HeeYong
101-1301 Gangnam Village
Seongbok-dong
Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-982 / KR
08 / KIM, Young-Myeong
105-705 Hyunjin Ever-vill Apt.
1-cha Seoksa-dong
Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-180 / KR
09 / KIM, Chun-Ki
102-1406 Kukdong Neulpureun Apt.
Hupyeong 1-dong
Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-161 / KR
10 / CHOI, Young Deuk
71-901 Hanyang Apt.
Apgujeong-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-110 / KR
 [2015/37]
Former [2010/07]01 / PARK, Chan-Woong
104, 314-1 Bora-dong Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-904 / KR
02 / YEOM, Myeong Hoon
104-1101 Byoksan 1-danji Jukjeon 2-dong Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-162 / KR
03 / CHO, Nam Hoon
306-1003 Sinwon Apt. Gumi-dong Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-500 / KR
04 / LEE, Sang Jun
205-702 Hansol LG Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-010 / KR
05 / LEE, Sang Min
106, 314-1 Bora-dong Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-904 / KR
06 / LEE, Jin Young
434-802 Kotme-maeul Hyundai Hometown Jukjeon-dong Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-160 / KR
07 / JEON, HeeYong
101-1301 Gangnam Village Seongbok-dong Suji-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-982 / KR
08 / KIM, Young-Myeong
105-705 Hyunjin Ever-vill Apt. 1-cha Seoksa-dong
Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-180 / KR
09 / KIM, Chun-Ki
102-1406 Kukdong Neulpureun Apt. Hupyeong 1-dong
Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-161 / KR
10 / CHOI, Young Deuk
71-901 Hanyang Apt. Apgujeong-dong Gangnam-gu
Seoul 135-110 / KR
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2015/37]
Former [2010/07]Enderlin, Eric André , et al
NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date08765961.128.05.2008
[2010/07]
WO2008KR02996
Priority number, dateKR2007005159328.05.2007         Original published format: KR 20070051593
KR2008004348809.05.2008         Original published format: KR 20080043488
[2010/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008147111
Date:04.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2152281
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008
[2010/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2152281
Date:09.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.02.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/258, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/02
[2015/16]
Former International [2013/15]A61K36/258, A61P29/00, A61P9/08, A61P9/10, A61Q19/08
Former International [2010/07]A61K36/258
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/37]
Former [2010/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOSMETISCHE VERWENDUNG VON GINSENG-BEEREN-EXTRAKT ZUM AUFHELLEN DER HAUT[2015/16]
English:COSMETIC USE OF GINSENG BERRY EXTRACT FOR SKIN WHITENING[2015/16]
French:UTILISATION COSMÉTIQUE D'EXTRAIT DE BAIES DE GINSENG POUR LE BLANCHIMENT DE LA PEAU[2015/16]
Former [2010/07]ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM EXTRAKT AUS GINSENG-BEEREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ISCHÄMISCHER HERZERKRANKUNG, UNTERSTÜTZUNG DES BLUTKREISLAUFES UND VON ANGIOGENESE, ZUR VERBESERUNG DES HAUTBILDES UND DER MÄNNLICHEN SEXUELLEN FUNKTION
Former [2010/07]COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIC HEART DISEASE, FACILITATION OF BLOOD CIRCULATION AND ANGIOGENESIS, IMPROVING SKIN BEAUTY, IMPROVING MALE SEXUAL FUNCTION CONTAINING GINSENG BERRY EXTRACT
Former [2010/07]COMPOSITION A BASE D'EXTRAIT DE BAIES DE GINSENG DESTINEE A TRAITER LA CARDIOPATHIE ISCHEMIQUE, FACILITER LA CIRCULATION SANGUINE ET L'ANGIOGENESE, RENFORCER LA BEAUTE DE LA PEAU ET AMELIORER LA FONCTION SEXUELLE MASCULINE
Entry into regional phase27.11.2009National basic fee paid 
27.11.2009Search fee paid 
27.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/07]
13.07.2010Observations by third parties
04.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2015Fee for grant paid
28.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP13189402.4  / EP2689784
EP13189406.5  / EP2703004
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.11.2013
Opposition(s)10.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.05.2008
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
BG09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
IE28.05.2016
LU28.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/32]HU28.05.2008
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
IE28.05.2016
LU28.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
MT31.05.2016
Former [2018/29]HU28.05.2008
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
TR09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
IE28.05.2016
LU28.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU28.05.2008
AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CY09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
MC09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
IE28.05.2016
LU28.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/38]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
IE28.05.2016
LU28.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
LU28.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
Former [2017/04]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
LU28.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT09.09.2015
BE09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
DK09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SI09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/24]AT09.09.2015
CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
PL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
PT11.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
RO09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
SK09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ09.09.2015
EE09.09.2015
ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
IS09.01.2016
Former [2016/21]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
IT09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/14]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NL09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES09.09.2015
FI09.09.2015
HR09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
SE09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI09.09.2015
LT09.09.2015
LV09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
GR10.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT09.09.2015
NO09.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT09.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2000212080  (AZUMA HIROSHI; SHIRATORI PHARM) [Y] 21,23 * abstract *
 [XY]  - A. S. ATTELE ET AL, "Antidiabetic Effects of Panax ginseng Berry Extract and the Identification of an Effective Component", DIABETES, (20020601), vol. 51, no. 6, doi:10.2337/diabetes.51.6.1851, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 1851 - 1858, XP055054573 [X] 1,3,5,7,9,10,12,14-18,20,24-26 * abstract * * page 1852, column 3 * * page 1853, column 4 * * page 1855, column 2 * * page 1856, columns 3,5,7 * * page 1857, columns 3,4 * [Y] 1-26

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.51.6.1851
 [XY]  - MEHENDALE S R ET AL, "Chronic pretreatment with American ginseng berry and its polyphenolic constituents attenuate oxidant stress in cardiomyocytes", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, vol. 553, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/J.EJPHAR.2006.09.051, ISSN 0014-2999, (20061228), pages 209 - 214, (20061228), XP028029383 [X] 1,3,5,7,9,10,12,14-20,22,24-26 * abstract * * page 210, column 2 * * page 213, columns 3,4 * * page 214, column 2 * [Y] 1-26

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejphar.2006.09.051
International search[Y]US2003152544  ;
 [X]  - LEUNG K.W. ET AL., "Non-genomic effects of ginsenoside-Re in endothelial cells via glucocorticoid receptor", FEBS LETTERS, (2007), vol. 581, pages 2423 - 2428, XP022086941

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2007.04.055
 [X]  - SHAO Z.-H. ET AL., "Antioxidant effects of American ginseng berry extract in cardiomyocytes exposed to acute oxidant stress", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2004), vol. 1670, pages 165 - 171, XP004491176

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbagen.2003.12.001
 [Y]  - KANG S.Y. ET AL., "Ginsenosides of the protopanaxatriol group cause endothelium-dependent relaxation in the rat aorta", LIFE SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 56, no. 19, pages 1577 - 1586, XP001162793

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0024-3205(95)00124-O
 [Y]  - YUE P.Y.K. ET AL., "Elucidation of the mechanisms underlying the angiogenetic effects of ginsenoside Rg1 in vivo and in vitro", ANGIOGENESIS, (2005), vol. 8, pages 205 - 216, XP019226914

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10456-005-9000-2
 [Y]  - CHEN X. ET AL., "Ginsenosides-induced nitric oxide-mediated relaxation of the rabbit corpus cavernosum", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1995), vol. 115, pages 15 - 18, XP002110278
 [Y]  - WANG C.-Z. ET AL., "Saponins Composition in American Ginseng Leaf and Berry Assayed by High-Performance Liquid Chromatography", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 54, no. 6, pages 2261 - 2266, XP008123032

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JF052993W
 [A]  - XIE J.-T. ET AL., "The anti-hyperglycemic property of different ginseng partitions", ORIENTAL PHARMACY AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2005), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 1 - 15, XP008124366

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3742/OPEM.2005.5.1.001
 [A]  - RHY J.-K. ET AL., "Free radical-scavenging activity of Korean red ginseng for erectile dysfunction in non-insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus rats", UROLOGY, (2005), vol. 65, no. 3, pages 611 - 615, XP004789802

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.urology.2004.10.038
 [A]  - XIE J.-T. ET AL., "Constituents and Effects of Ginseng Leaf", ORIENTAL PHARMACY AND EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 1 - 8, XP008143339
 [A]  - LEE S.E. ET AL., "Antioxidant Activities of Leaf, Stem and Root of Panax ginseng C.A. Meyer", KOREAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CROP SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 237 - 242
 [A]  - PARK J.D. ET AL., "Biological activities and chemistry of saponins from Panax ginseng C.A. Meyer", PHYTOCHEMISTRY REVIEWS, (2005), vol. 4, pages 159 - 175, XP019262336
 [A]  - NAM K.Y. ET AL., "Relationship of Saponin and Non-saponin for the Quality of Ginseng", JOURNAL OF GINSENG RESEARCH, vol. 22, no. 4, pages 274 - 283, XP001539883
 [A]  - HWANG E.Y. ET AL., "Quantitative Analysis of Phenolic Compounds in Different parts of Panax ginseng C.A. Meyer and Its Inhibitory Effect of Melanin Biosynthesis", KOREAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CROP SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 148 - 152, XP008124365
Examination   - LEE ET AL, "Panax ginseng induces human Type I collagen synthesis through activation of Smad signaling", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER IRELAND LTD, IE, (20061130), vol. 109, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.JEP.2006.06.008, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 29 - 34, XP005786330

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2006.06.008
other   - "Laksmana", TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/539, XP003027380
    - SOSHALA, Sodhalanighantauh, (1978), vol. 1ST, page 139