Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2167732

EP2167732 - ARTIFICIAL GRASS COMPOSED OF FIBRES COMPRISING OF A CORE AND A CLADDING, AS WELL AS AN ARTIFICIAL LAWN MADE UP THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.08.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 29.11.2017  [2017/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tapijtfabriek H. Desseaux N.V.
Taxandriaweg 15
5142 PA Waalwijk / NL
[2010/13]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN REIJEN, Peter
Stadrijk 213
NL-5403 NK Uden / NL
 [2010/13]
Representative(s)Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V.
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[2013/44]
Former [2010/13]Blokland, Arie , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau, P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date08766718.405.06.2008
[2010/13]
WO2008NL00145
Priority number, dateNL2007103394907.06.2007         Original published format: NL 1033949
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008150156
Date:11.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2167732
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008
[2010/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2167732
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:E01C13/08, D01F8/02, D01F8/04, D06M14/10, D06M15/03, D06M15/07, D06M15/333, D06N7/00
[2010/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/13]
TitleGerman:AUS EINEN KERN UND EINEN MANTEL UMFASSENDEN FASERN BESTEHENDES KUNSTGRAS SOWIE DARAUS HERGESTELLTER RASEN[2010/13]
English:ARTIFICIAL GRASS COMPOSED OF FIBRES COMPRISING OF A CORE AND A CLADDING, AS WELL AS AN ARTIFICIAL LAWN MADE UP THEREOF[2010/13]
French:GAZON ARTIFICIEL À BASE DE FIBRES CONSTITUÉES D'UNE ÂME ET D'UNE GAINE ET PELOUSE ARTIFICIELLE AINSI RÉALISÉE[2010/13]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2009National basic fee paid 
22.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/13]
15.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.02.2014
30.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2014Fee for grant paid
21.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  30.06.2015   
Ten Cate Thiolon B.V.
G. van der Muelenweg 2
7443 RE Nijverdal / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau, et al
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [2015/32]
05.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition25.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0233/17
27.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.06.2008
AT01.10.2014
BE01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE05.06.2015
LU05.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
[2017/46]
Former [2017/39]HU05.06.2008
AT01.10.2014
BG01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
TR01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE05.06.2015
LU05.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2017/03]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
MT01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE05.06.2015
LU05.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/22]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE05.06.2015
LU05.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/20]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
IE05.06.2015
LU05.06.2015
Former [2016/11]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SI01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
LU05.06.2015
Former [2016/09]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
MC01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
IT01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
SK01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
RO01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
EE01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/34]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
DK01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT01.10.2014
CY01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT01.10.2014
CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/24]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
HR01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
LV01.10.2014
PL01.10.2014
SE01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
GR02.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/23]CZ01.10.2014
ES01.10.2014
FI01.10.2014
LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
IS01.02.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
PT02.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT01.10.2014
NO01.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT01.10.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US5272005  (COLLIER JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 24-27 * column 1, line 47 - line 56; claims 1,2 * * column 2, line 33 - line 38 * * column 3, line 47 - line 53 *;
 [X]US5009954  (COLLIER JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 24-27 * column 3, line 16 - line 25; claim - *;
 [X]US2002177379  (ABED JEAN-CLAUDE [US], et al) [X] 24-27 * page 1, paragraph 8; examples 1,2,4; claims 1-3,10,12-15,22,24 * * page 2, paragraph 16 *;
 [XY]WO2005111281  (TEN CATE THIOLON BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 3, lines 8-12,18-21; figure -; claims 1,8,10,13,18,19 * * page 4, line 4 - line 12 * * page 6, line 2 - line 10 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 27 * * page 9, line 5 * [Y] 14-18;
 [YA]WO2006068476  (DESSEAUX H TAPIJTFAB [NL], et al) [Y] 14-18 * page 2, line 18 - line 24; claims 1,2,4,5,11-16 * * page 3, line 20 - line 23 * [A] 1-27;
 [A]JPH10235025  (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-27 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0259940  (NIJVERDAL TEN CATE TEXTIEL [NL]) [A] 1-27 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 23; claims 1,11-14,21 *
by applicantEP0996781
 WO2005111281
 WO2004106601