Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2170316

EP2170316 - Improving memory in subjects with mini-mental state examination of 24-26 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/14]IMPROVING MEMORY IN SUBJECTS WITH MINI-MENTAL STATE EXAMINATION OF 24-26
[2011/42]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
08.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/14]For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KAMPHUIS, Patrick Joseph Gerardus Hendrikus
Adriaen Van Ostadelaan 118
NL-3583 AM Utrecht / NL
02 / GROENENDIJK, Martine
Mazurkastraat 50
NL-2992 GP Barendrecht / NL
03 / BONGERS, Anke
Schubertweg 45
NL-3906 BD Veenendaal / NL
 [2010/14]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2010/14]Swinkels, Bart Willem
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date08766834.920.06.2008
[2010/14]
WO2008NL50411
Priority number, dateWO2007NL5030626.06.2007         Original published format: PCT/NL2007/050306
WO2007NL5030726.06.2007         Original published format: PCT/NL2007/050307
WO2007NL5031027.06.2007         Original published format: PCT/NL2007/050310
EP2007012381120.12.2007         Original published format: EP 07123811
WO2008NL5012404.03.2008         Original published format: PCT/NL2008/050124
[2010/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009002166
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2170316
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008
[2010/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2170316
Date:18.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/557, A61K31/7072, A23L1/30, A23L1/304, A23L1/302, A61P25/28
[2012/28]
Former International [2011/41]A61K31/557, A61K31/7072, A23L1/30, A23L1/304, A23L1/302, A61P25/28, A61P43/00
Former International [2010/14]A61K31/20, A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A61K31/14, A61K31/202, A61K31/7072, A61P25/28, A61P43/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/14]
TitleGerman:Verbesserung des Gedächtnisses von Personen mit mini-mental State Untersuchung von 24-26[2011/42]
English:Improving memory in subjects with mini-mental state examination of 24-26[2011/42]
French:Amélioration de la mémoire chez des sujet ayant un mini-examen de l'état mental de 24-26[2013/43]
Former [2010/14]VERBESSERUNG DES GEDÄCHTNISSES VON PERSONEN MIT MINI-MENTAL STATE UNTERSUCHUNG VON 24-26
Former [2010/14]IMPROVING MEMORY IN SUBJECTS WITH MINI-MENTAL STATE EXAMINATION OF 24-26
Former [2010/14]AMÉLIORATION DE LA MÉMOIRE AU MOYEN D'UN MINI-EXAMEN DE L'ÉTAT MENTAL BASÉ SUR UNE ÉVALUATION DE 24-26
Entry into regional phase22.12.2009National basic fee paid 
22.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/14]
30.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.10.2012Fee for grant paid
25.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP13189474.3  / EP2689782
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.07.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014  08.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.09.2014  22.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
 [2019/30]
Former [2014/43]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014  08.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
 02  17.09.2014   
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2014/41]
Opponent(s)01  03.09.2014   
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Krömer-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH, et al
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
23.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.07.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2169/16
25.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.06.2008
BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
MT18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
LU20.06.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/25]BG18.12.2013
CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
MT18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
LU20.06.2014
Former [2016/16]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
MT18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
LU20.06.2014
Former [2015/24]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SI18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
LU20.06.2014
Former [2015/09]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
MC18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
LU20.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY18.12.2013
CZ18.12.2013
EE18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
RO18.12.2013
SK18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
Former [2014/36]EE18.12.2013
HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
IS18.04.2014
Former [2014/25]HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
LV18.12.2013
Former [2014/23]HR18.12.2013
LT18.12.2013
Former [2014/20]LT18.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO2006127620  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [DX] 1-7 * examples 1-11; claims 13-15,17-20 *;
 [X]WO03041701  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7 * example S2; claims 1-7,12; table 1 * * page 9, lines 23-25 * * page 10, lines 12-17 *;
 [X]EP1666092  (TROMMSDORFF ARZNEIMITTEL [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0106] *;
 [DY]WO2007008586  (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [DY] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPH1171274  (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [DY]WO2006031683  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [DY] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [PX]WO2007073178  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [PX]EP1800675  (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [PX] 1-7 * examples 1-4; claim 9 *;
 [A]WO2007058538  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * example 3; claims 1-11 * * page 10, line 14 - page 13, line 3 *
 [X]  - WURTMAN ET AL, "Synaptic proteins and phospholipids are increased in gerbil brain by administering uridine plus docosahexaenoic acid orally", BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060509), vol. 1088, no. 1, ISSN 0006-8993, pages 83 - 92, XP005446770 [X] 1-7 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2006.03.019