Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2177045

EP2177045 - IMPROVED EARPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 29.01.2020  [2020/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freebit AS
Postboks 3150 Elisenberg
0208 Oslo / NO
[2012/16]
Former [2010/16]For all designated states
Freebit AS
Postboks 3150 Elisenberg
0208 Oslo / NO
Inventor(s)01 / STEENFELDT BERG, Richard
c/o Freebit AS
Boks 3150 Elisenberg
0208 Oslo / NO
 [2012/16]
Former [2010/23]01 / STEENFELDT BERG, Richard
c/o Freebit AS Boks 3150 Elisenberg
0208 Oslo / NO
Former [2010/16]01 / STEENFELDT BERG, Richard
c/o Freebit AS Boks 3150 Elisenberg
3150 Elisenberg / NO
Representative(s)Valea AB , et al
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2011/39]Acapo AS , et al
P.O. Box 1880 Nordnes
5817 Bergen / NO
Former [2011/37]Ildahl, Bjørn Storm , et al
Tandbergs Patentkontor AS P.O. Box 1570 Vika
0118 Oslo / NO
Former [2010/16]Tisthammer, Bjørn
Tandbergs Patentkontor AS Box 1570 Vika
0118 Oslo / NO
Application number, filing date08766905.730.05.2008
[2010/16]
WO2008NO00190
Priority number, dateNO2007000281201.06.2007         Original published format: NO 20072812
[2010/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008147215
Date:04.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2177045
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008
[2010/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2177045
Date:18.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:XN04.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/10
[2010/47]
Former International [2010/16]H04R1/10, H04M1/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/16]
Extension statesAL04.01.2010
BA04.01.2010
MK04.01.2010
RS04.01.2010
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER OHRHÖRER[2010/16]
English:IMPROVED EARPIECE[2010/16]
French:ECOUTEUR AMÉLIORÉ[2010/16]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2010National basic fee paid 
04.01.2010Search fee paid 
04.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/16]
15.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2011Date of oral proceedings
17.01.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2012Fee for grant paid
09.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11188661.0  / EP2434777
EP15179718.0  / EP3016406
EP19218968.6
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.02.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.2013  24.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Santarelli SA
14 avenue de la Grande Armée
75017 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
 02  07.06.2017  07.06.2017  INTERVENTION
Bose GmbH
Max-Planck-Str. 36
61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
 03  21.03.2018  21.03.2018  INTERVENTION
Bose Limited
Bose House Quayside
Chatham Maritime
Chatham
Kent ME4 4QZ / GB
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
 [2018/17]
Former [2017/35]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2013  24.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Santarelli SA
14 avenue de la Grande Armée
75017 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
 02  07.06.2017  07.06.2017  INTERVENTION
Bose GmbH
Max-Planck-Str. 36
61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/09]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2013  24.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Santarelli SA
14 avenue de la Grande Armée
75017 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Santarelli
14, Avenue de la Grande-Armée
75017 Paris / FR
Former [2013/08]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2013   
Santarelli SA
14 avenue de la Grande Armée
75017 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Barr, Angela Loise
Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée
75017 Paris / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
26.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
27.04.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/31]
12.06.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0384/15
22.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
27.04.2018Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
27.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
09.05.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Petition(s) for review:22.08.2018Petition for review received
 Number:  R0010/18
 for appeal No.  T0384/15-3503
 Petitioner:  APPR
14.10.2019Decision:  Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only.
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH18.04.2012
CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LI18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
LU30.05.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
RO30.05.2016
MC31.05.2016
CZ30.05.2017
SK30.05.2017
HU31.05.2017
GR06.12.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/32]CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
LU30.05.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
RO30.05.2016
MC31.05.2016
CZ30.05.2017
SK30.05.2017
HU31.05.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/11]CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
LU30.05.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
RO30.05.2016
CZ30.05.2017
SK30.05.2017
HU31.05.2017
GR06.12.2017
Former [2018/10]CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
LU30.05.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
RO30.05.2016
CZ30.05.2017
SK30.05.2017
HU31.05.2017
Former [2018/09]CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
LU30.05.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
RO30.05.2016
HU31.05.2017
Former [2017/10]CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
LU30.05.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
RO30.05.2016
Former [2014/27]CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
LU30.05.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
Former [2013/35]CY18.04.2012
EE18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
MT18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
Former [2012/51]CY18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
SI18.04.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
Former [2012/50]CY18.04.2012
HR18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
LV18.04.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
Former [2012/49]CY18.04.2012
LT18.04.2012
NO18.07.2012
IS18.08.2012
Former [2012/47]LT18.04.2012
NO18.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO0245390  (HYPERTEC AS [NO], et al) [YD] 1-5 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 12 * * figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]US2005008180  (SMITH RICHARD C [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0038] , [0041] - [0042] * * figures 1-4 *;
 [AD]WO2004100508  (HILLESTAD JANN [NO], et al) [AD] 1-5 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 12 * * abstract * * figure 3b *;
 [A]WO03096745  (KAH JR CARL L C [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 29 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO03075608  (LOGITECH EUROP SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 5, lines 11-14 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE102005044417  (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0021] * * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE8328154U  (PETER ZACHO) [A] 1-5 * page 5, lines 16-22 * * figure 2 *
International search[YD]WO0245390  (HYPERTEC AS [NO], et al);
 [Y]WO0150813  (CARILLO ANGELO ALFONSO [IT]);
 [Y]WO2004100508  (HILLESTAD JANN [NO], et al)
by applicantUS6122388
 US5659156
 US5943627
 DE29718483U
 WO0245390
 NO312989B
 WO0150813
 WO2004100508