EP2155751 - PYRROLOPYRIMIDIN-7-ONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PHARMACEUTICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2010/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYRAKDARIAN, Malken AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal, Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 02 /
BUON, Christophe AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal, Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 03 /
CANTIN, Louis-David AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal, Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 04 /
HU, Yun-Jin AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal, Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 05 /
LUO, Xuehong AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal, Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 06 /
SANTHAKUMAR, Vijayaratnam AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal, Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | 07 /
TOMASZEWSKI, Miroslaw AstraZeneca R & D Montreal 7171 Frederick-Banting Ville St. Laurent Montreal, Québec H4S 1Z9 / CA | [2010/08] | Application number, filing date | 08767136.8 | 07.05.2008 | [2010/08] | WO2008SE50525 | Priority number, date | US20070916588P | 08.05.2007 Original published format: US 916588 P | [2010/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008136756 | Date: | 13.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155751 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61P13/10, A61P25/04, A61P25/14, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P9/00, C07D519/00 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | PYRROLOPYRIMIDIN-7-ON-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [2010/08] | English: | PYRROLOPYRIMIDIN-7-ONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PHARMACEUTICALS | [2010/08] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRROLOPYRIMIDIN-7-ONE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 02.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 30.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1352659 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [A]EP1348707 (USTAV EX BOTAN AV CR I OF EX B [CZ]); | [A]WO2007035873 (PHARMACOPEIA DRUG DISCOVERY [US], et al); | [Y] - MAGGI C.A. ET AL., "Men 10,627, a novel polycyclic peptide antagonist of tachykinin NK2 receptors", THE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (1994), vol. 271, no. 3, pages 1489 - 1500, XP002948170 | [A] - AHARONY D. ET AL., "Pharmacological characterization of a new class of nonpeptide neurokinin a antagonists that demonstrate species selectivity", THE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THRERAPEUTICS, (1995), vol. 274, no. 3, pages 1216 - 1221, XP003024020 |