blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2283532

EP2283532 - A FUEL CELL POWER PLANT HAVING IMPROVED OPERATING EFFICIENCIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.04.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.05.2011  [2011/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UTC Power Corporation
195 Governors Highway
South Windsor, CT 06074 / US
[2011/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PERRY, Michael, L.
1995 Main Street
Glastonbury CT 06033 / US
02 / DARLING, Robert, M.
10 Kent Lane
South Windsor CT 06074 / US
 [2011/11]
Former [2011/07]01 / PERRY, Michael, L.
1995 Main Street
Glastonbury CT 06033 / US
02 / DARLING, Robert, M.
301 Abbe Road Ext
South Windsor CT 06074 / US
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date08767644.107.05.2008
[2011/07]
WO2008US05873
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009136890
Date:12.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2283532
Date:16.02.2011
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2011/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2009
ClassificationIPC:H01M8/04
[2011/07]
CPC:
H01M8/04029 (EP,US); H01M8/023 (EP,US); H01M8/04179 (EP,US);
H01M8/04716 (EP,US); H01M8/04723 (EP,US); H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04768 (EP,US); H01M2008/1095 (EP,US); H01M8/04074 (EP,US);
H01M8/04164 (EP,US); H01M8/04343 (EP,US); H01M8/0435 (EP,US);
H01M8/04358 (EP,US); Y02E60/50 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZELLEN-KRAFTWERK MIT VERBESSERTEN BETRIEBSEFFIZIENZEN[2011/07]
English:A FUEL CELL POWER PLANT HAVING IMPROVED OPERATING EFFICIENCIES[2011/07]
French:CENTRALE À PILES À COMBUSTIBLE À EFFICACITÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT AMÉLIORÉE[2011/07]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2010National basic fee paid 
07.12.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/07]
17.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[DY]US6911275  (MICHELS H HARVEY [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, lines 19-43 * * column 6, lines 37-51 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO2004088768  (NUVERA FUEL CELLS EUROP SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 10, line 2 - page 11, line 13 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]US2005142420  (YANG DELIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.