Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2158321

EP2158321 - METHOD OF EXPANDING HUMAN HEPATOCYTES IN VIVO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.03.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oregon Health & Science University
Office of Technology & Research Collaborations
2525 SW First Avenue
Suite 120
Portland, OR 97201 / US
For all designated states
The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Office of the General Counsel
Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad
P.O. Box 20386
Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US
[2019/38]
Former [2010/09]For all designated states
Oregon Health and Science University
Office of Technology & Research Collaborations 2525 SW First Avenue Suite 120
Portland, OR 97201 / US
For all designated states
The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University
1705 El Camino Real
Palo Alto CA 94306-1106 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GROMPE, Markus
6545 Sw 34th Avenue
Portland, OR 97239 / US
02 / AZUMA, Hisaya
2-10-7 Imagawa Suginamiku
Tokyo 167-0035 / JP
03 / AL-DHALIMY, Muhsen
12995 South West Rita Drive
Beaverton, OR 97005 / US
04 / KAY, Mark, A.
565 Casita Way
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
 [2010/09]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/13]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2010/09]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08770211.405.06.2008
[2010/09]
WO2008US65937
Priority number, dateUS20070933432P05.06.2007         Original published format: US 933432 P
[2010/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008151283
Date:11.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2158321
Date:03.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2008
[2010/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/85, A01K67/027, C12N15/861, C12N5/06
[2010/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/09]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR IN-VIVO-EXPANSION MENSCHLICHER LEBERZELLEN[2010/09]
English:METHOD OF EXPANDING HUMAN HEPATOCYTES IN VIVO[2010/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'EXPANSION IN VIVO D'HÉPATOCYTES HUMAINS[2010/09]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2010National basic fee paid 
05.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/09]
25.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
29.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
29.10.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination04.12.2013Appeal received No.  T1111/14
05.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
06.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO0017338  (EINSTEIN COLL MED [US]) [DA] 1,32,36 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1496110  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]; HIROSHIMA IND PROMOTION ORGANI [JP]) [A] 1,32,36 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044]; claims 1-7,10-16,21,22 *;
 [DA]WO0167854  (KNETEMAN NORMAN M [CA]; TYRRELL D LORNE [CA]; MERCER DAVID F [CA]) [DA] 1,32,36 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO0107338  (PILOT KK [JP]; KITAHARA ATSUSHI [JP]; KOZIMA MIKIO [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [PX]  - AZUMA H, PAULK N, RANADE A, DORRELL C, AL-DHALIMY M, ELLIS E, STROM S, KAY MA, FINEGOLD M, GROMPE M., "Robust expansion of human hepatocytes in Fah-/-/Rag2-/-/Il2rg-/- mice", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (20070729), vol. 25, no. 8, pages 903 - 910, XP002493009 [PX] 1-42 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1326
 [PX]  - DAVID A SHAFRITZ, "A human hepatocyte factory", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200708), vol. 25, pages 871 - 872, XP002493010 [PX] 1-42 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0807-871
 [PX]  - BISSIG KD, LE TT, WOODS NB, VERMA IM., "Repopulation of adult and neonatal mice with human hepatocytes: a chimeric animal model", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20071211), vol. 104, no. 51, pages 20507 - 20511, XP002493011 [PX] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0710528105
 [AD]  - DANDRI M, BURDA MR, TÖRÖK E, POLLOK JM, IWANSKA A, SOMMER G, ROGIERS X, ROGLER CE, GUPTA S, WILL H, GRETEN H, PETERSEN J., "Repopulation of mouse liver with human hepatocytes and in vivo infection with hepatitis B virus.", HEPATOLOGY., (200104), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 981 - 988, XP002277302 [AD] 1,32,36 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - TATENO C, ET AL, "Near completely humanized liver in mice shows human-type metabolic responses to drugs.", AM J PATHOL., (200409), vol. 165, no. 3, pages 901 - 912, XP002493012 [DA] 1,32,36 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - TURRINI P ET AL., "Development of humanized mice for the study of hepatitis C virus infection", TRANSPLANT PROC., (200605), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 1181 - 1184, XP002493013 [AD] 1,32,36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.transproceed.2006.02.149
 [A]  - MERCER D F ET AL, "Hepatitis C virus replication in mice with chimeric human livers", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010801), vol. 7, no. 8, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 927 - 933, XP002273301 [A] 1,32,36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/90968
 [A]  - WILLENBRING H ; BAILEY A S; FOSTER M ; AKKARI Y ; DORRELL C ; OLSON S ; FINEGOLD M ; FLEMING W H; GROMPE M, "Myelomonocytic cells are sufficient for therapeutic cell fusion in liver", NATURE MEDICINE, (200407), vol. 10, no. 7, pages 744 - 748, XP002493014 [A] 1,2,32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1062
 [A]  - OVERTURF K, AL-DHALIMY M, FINEGOLD M, GROMPE M., "The repopulation potential of hepatocyte populations differing in size and prior mitotic expansion.", AM J PATHOL., (199912), vol. 155, no. 6, pages 2135 - 2143, XP002493015 [A] 1,2,13-21,32 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - APONTE JL, SEGA GA, HAUSER LJ, DHAR MS, WITHROW CM, CARPENTER DA, RINCHIK EM, CULIAT CT, JOHNSON DK., "Point mutations in the murine fumarylacetoacetate hydrolase gene: Animal models for the human genetic disorder hereditary tyrosinemia type 1", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A., (20010116), vol. 98, no. 2, pages 641 - 645, XP002493016 [DA] 1,2,4,32,35 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.98.2.641
 [A]  - KLEBIG M L ET AL, "MURINE FUMARYLACETOACETATE HYDROLASE FAH GENE IS DISRUPTED BY A NEONATALLY LETHAL ALBINO DELETION THAT DEFINES THE HEPATOCYTE-SPECIFIC DEVELOPMENTAL REGULATION 1 HSDR-1 LOCUS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (19920201), vol. 89, no. 4, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1363 - 1367, XP002255637 [A] 1,2,4,32,35 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.4.1363
 [A]  - ENDO F, SUN MS., "Tyrosinaemia type I and apoptosis of hepatocytes and renal tubular cells", INHERIT METAB DIS., (200205), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 227 - 234, XP002493018 [A] 1,2,32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1015646400182
 [A]  - O'BRIEN SJ, BERMAN EJ, ESTES JD, GARDNER MB., "Murine retroviral restriction genes Fv-4 and Akvr-1 are alleles of a single locus.", O'BRIEN SJ, BERMAN EJ, ESTES JD, GARDNER MB., (198308), vol. 47, no. 3, pages 649 - 651, XP002493019 [A] 3,34 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SHULTZ LD, ISHIKAWA F, GREINER DL., "Humanized mice in translational biomedical research.", NAT REV IMMUNOL., (200702), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 118 - 130, XP002493022 [A] 32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri2017
 [DA]  - TRAGGIAI E ET AL, "Development of a human adaptive immune system in cord blood cell-transplanted mice", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (20040402), vol. 304, no. 5667, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 104 - 107, XP002356076 [DA] 1,3,32,33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1093933
 [AP]  - NAKAMURA K, TANAKA Y, MITSUBUCHI H, ENDO F., "Animal models of tyrosinemia.", J NUTR., (200706), vol. 137, no. 6sup1, pages 1556S - 1560S, XP002493017 [AP] 1,2,32 * the whole document *
 [PA]  - KATOH M, TATENO C, YOSHIZATO K, YOKOI T., "Chimeric mice with humanized liver", TOXICOLOGY., (20071122), vol. 246, no. 1, pages 9 - 17, XP002493023 [PA] 32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tox.2007.11.012