Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2170040

EP2170040 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KILLING WEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, MT
published on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Force Technology
Park Allé 345
2605 Brøndby / DK
[2010/14]
Inventor(s)01 / KREBS, Niels
Bøgehøj 45
DK-2900 Hellerup / DK
02 / KRUSE, Jesper
Kyse Overdrevs Vej 28
DK-4700 Næstved / DK
 [2010/14]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[2016/07]
Former [2013/03]Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2010/14]Hendriksen, David
Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date08775017.011.07.2008
[2010/14]
WO2008EP59100
Priority number, dateDK2007000107120.07.2007         Original published format: DK 200701071
[2010/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009013154
Date:29.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2170040
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009
[2010/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2170040
Date:17.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A01M21/04
[2010/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/07]
Former [2010/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNKRAUTVERNICHTUNG[2010/14]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR KILLING WEEDS[2010/14]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR TUER DES MAUVAISES HERBES[2010/14]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2010National basic fee paid 
15.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
06.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2015Fee for grant paid
27.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2015Information about intention to grant a patent
11.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2012
Opposition(s)18.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/04]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.02.2015Request for further processing filed
10.02.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.02.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.04.2013Request for further processing filed
19.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.05.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.07.2008
AT17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
IS17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
TR17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
LU11.07.2016
MT31.07.2016
[2018/32]
Former [2018/29]HU11.07.2008
AT17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
TR17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
LU11.07.2016
Former [2018/28]HU11.07.2008
AT17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
HR17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
LU11.07.2016
Former [2018/27]HU11.07.2008
AT17.02.2016
CY17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
EE17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
LU11.07.2016
Former [2017/49]AT17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
LU11.07.2016
Former [2017/44]AT17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
IT11.07.2016
LU11.07.2016
Former [2017/15]AT17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
MC17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SI17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
BG17.05.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT17.02.2016
CZ17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
RO17.02.2016
SK17.02.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
LV17.02.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
GR18.05.2016
PT17.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT17.02.2016
FI17.02.2016
LT17.02.2016
GR18.05.2016
Former [2016/35]FI17.02.2016
GR18.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO02078751  (FORCE TECHNOLOGY [DK]; KREBS NIELS [DK]) [X] 11-15,18 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 10 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 13 * * page 8, lines 5-22 * * figures 2-6 *;
 [X]US5974728  (NICHOLS JAMES C [US]) [X] 11,12,14,15,18 * column 1, lines 8-16 * * column 5, lines 8-32 * * column 7, line 23 - column 8, line 22 * * figures 9-12 *;
 [A]EP1038440  (WR DAMP APS [DK]) [A] 1,4,9-11,14,18-20 * column 2, paragraph 12 - column 3, paragraph 14 * * page 3, paragraph 18 * * figures 1a,1b,2 *;
 [A]DE20117163U  (KALFHAUS HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1,2,9-12,18-20 * page 1, paragraphs 3-8 * * figure 1 *
ExaminationWO2008106970