Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2171962

EP2171962 - DELIVERY OF SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2017  [2017/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cassidian Finland Oy
Hiomotie 32
00380 Helsinki / FI
[2011/41]
Former [2010/14]For all designated states
EADS Secure Networks Oy
Hiomotie 32
00380 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / LEHTONEN, Juha
Ratsumiehentie 5 D
FI-02430 Masala / FI
 [2010/14]
Representative(s)Kolster Oy Ab
(Salmisaarenaukio 1)
P.O. Box 204
00181 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2012/07]Honkasalo, Terhi Marjut Anneli , et al
Kolster Oy Ab
Iso Roobertinkatu 23
PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2011/41]Lebkiri, Alexandre , et al
Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 87 Rue Taitbout
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2011/22]Honkasalo, Terhi Marjut Anneli , et al
Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148
00121 Helsinki / FI
Former [2010/14]Keinänen, Anu
Kolster Oy Ab P.O.Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23)
00121 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date08775507.023.06.2008
[2010/14]
WO2008FI50382
Priority number, dateFI2007000548425.06.2007         Original published format: FI 20075484
[2010/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009000968
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2171962
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008
[2010/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2010/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/14]
TitleGerman:BEREITSTELLUNG VON TEILNEHMERIDENTIFIKATIONSINFORMATIONEN[2010/14]
English:DELIVERY OF SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY INFORMATION[2010/14]
French:DÉLIVRANCE D'INFORMATIONS D'IDENTITÉ D'ABONNÉ[2010/14]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2010National basic fee paid 
18.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
01.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/22]
25.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201609   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO02101981  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; VALLSTROEM JARI [FI]; MANNINEN PETRI [FI]) [A] 1-53 * page 5, line 32 - page 11, line 32 *;
 [A]GB2416279  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-53 * page 23, line 19 - page 27, line 2 * * page 34, line 1 - page 35, line 21 *;
 [A]WO03065751  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; LAAKSONEN PIRKKO [FI]) [A] 1-53 * page 6, line 18 - page 10, line 15 *;
 [A]GB2393613  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-53 * page 4, line 25 - page 9, line 30 * * page 11, line 31 - page 14, line 6 *;
 [A]GB2423887  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-53 * page 14, line 5 - page 16, line 5 * * page 21, line 22 - page 25, line 22 *;
 [DX]  - "Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA); Voice plus Data (V+D); Part 2: Air Interface (AI); ETSI TS 100 392-2", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20060901), vol. TETRA-3, no. V3.1.1, ISSN 0000-0001, pages 333 - 383, XP002499314 [DX] 1-53 *Section 16.4*
 [DA]  - "Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA); Voice plus Data (V+D); Part 7: Security; Draft ETSI EN 300 392-7", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070401), vol. TETRA;TETRA-6, no. V3.0.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014037285 [DA] 1-53 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "TETRA Key Distribution (KD)", TETRA MOU SFPG - RECOMENDATION 01, EDITION 4, (20060724), URL: http://www.tetramou.com/uploadedFiles/Files/Documents/Rec01ed4.pdf, (20081009), XP002499315 [A] 1-53 *Section 3 and 6*