Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2162525

EP2162525 - PERFUMED HOUSEHOLD PRODUCTS AND METHODS FOR PRESERVING PERFUME INTEGRITY AND EXTENDING FRAGRANCE LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2010/11]
Inventor(s)01 / WOO, Ricky, Ah-Man
6940 Van Gordon Road
Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US
02 / LIU, Zaiyou
8040 Stone Barn Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
03 / JACKSON, Rhonda, Jean
5945 Rhode Island Avenue
Cincinnati, Ohio 45237 / US
 [2010/17]
Former [2010/11]01 / WOO, Ricky, Ah-Man
6940 Van Gordon Road
Hamilton, Ohio 45011 / US
02 / LIU, Zaiyou
8040 Stone Barn Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
03 / JACKSON, Rhonda, Jean
1370 camberly Drive
Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US
Representative(s)Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP
Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor
Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/03]Pierce, Christopher James , et al
Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Former [2010/11]Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date08776538.426.06.2008
[2010/11]
WO2008IB52582
Priority number, dateUS2007082329327.06.2007         Original published format: US 823293
US2008006136902.04.2008         Original published format: US 61369
US2008010058510.04.2008         Original published format: US 100585
[2010/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009001320
Date:31.12.2008
Language:EN
[2009/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2162525
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2008
[2010/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/50, C11D17/04, A61L9/01
[2010/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/11]
TitleGerman:PARFÜMIERTE HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BEWAHRUNG DER DUFTSTOFFINTEGRITÄT UND ZUR AROMAVERLÄNGERUNG[2010/11]
English:PERFUMED HOUSEHOLD PRODUCTS AND METHODS FOR PRESERVING PERFUME INTEGRITY AND EXTENDING FRAGRANCE LIFE[2010/11]
French:PRODUITS MÉNAGERS PARFUMÉS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CONSERVER L'INTÉGRITÉ DU PARFUM ET PROLONGER LA DURÉE DE SENTEUR DU PARFUM[2010/11]
Entry into regional phase17.11.2009National basic fee paid 
17.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/11]
19.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.06.2017
29.06.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination25.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2798/17
30.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.08.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
02.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0055292  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]; WOO RICKY AH MAN [US]; REECE STEVEN [US]; STREU) [X] 1-14 * example 1 * * page 1 "Background of the Invention" *