blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2163354

EP2163354 - ELECTRIC RAMMING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Makita Corporation
11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho 3-chome
Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-8502 / JP
[2010/11]
Inventor(s)01 / SUDA, Hidekazu
c/o MAKITA CORPORATION 11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho 3-chome
Anjo-shi Aichi 446-8502 / JP
 [2010/11]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/11]Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen
European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date08777330.518.06.2008
[2010/11]
WO2008JP61131
Priority number, dateJP2007017021328.06.2007         Original published format: JP 2007170213
[2010/11]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009001729
Date:31.12.2008
Language:JA
[2009/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2163354
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP31.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2011
ClassificationIPC:B25C7/00, B25C1/06, B25C1/00
[2011/21]
CPC:
B25C1/06 (EP,US); B25C1/008 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2010/11]B25C7/00, B25C1/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/11]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES STAMPFWERKZEUG[2010/11]
English:ELECTRIC RAMMING TOOL[2010/11]
French:OUTIL DE DAMAGE ÉLECTRIQUE[2010/11]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2010Translation filed 
15.01.2010National basic fee paid 
15.01.2010Search fee paid 
15.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/11]
15.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/44]
08.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201508   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4679719  (KRAMER FRANCIS J [US]) [Y] 1,4* columns 3-7; figure - *;
 [Y]GB2284377  (MAX CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6 * pages 6-13; figure - *;
 [Y]US6116488  (LEE YUN-CHUNG [TW]) [Y] 1-6 * columns 2-5; figure - *;
 [Y]US6431425  (MOORMAN CHARLES J [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * columns 2,10-16; figure - *;
 [Y]US2002185514  (ADAMS SHANE [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017] - [0047] - [0060]; figure - *
International search[A]JPH07237148  (MAX CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * , Par. Nos. [0009] to [0010]; Figs. 1 to 9 & US 5597106 A & GB 2286790 A & DE 19506942 A1 *;
 [A]JPH0890449  (MAKITA CORP) [A] 1-6 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH10230473  (MAX CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * , Par. Nos. [0004] to [0006]; Figs. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2001179656  (MAKITA CORP) [A] 1-6 * , Full text; all drawings & US 2001/6183 A1 *;
 [Y]JP2004536542  (Senco Products, Inc.) [Y] 1-6 * , Par. Nos. [0079] to [0080]; Fig. 1 & US 2002/104869 A1 & WO 2002/51591 A1 & CA 2432980 A1 *;
 [A]JP2006026858  (MAX CO LTD) [A] 1-6* , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2007098560  (MAKITA CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , Par. Nos. [0022] to [0023]; Figs. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007136598  (HITACHI KOKI KK) [A] 1-6 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *
ExaminationUS4129240
 US2005040206
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.