Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2169594

EP2169594 - WIRELESS IC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2018/10]
Former [2010/13]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd.
10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IKEMOTO, Nobuo
c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
 [2018/10]
Former [2010/13]01 / IKEMOTO, Nobuo
c/o Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Schenk, Markus
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[2018/10]
Former [2010/13]Schenk, Markus
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date08778235.517.07.2008
[2010/13]
WO2008JP62884
Priority number, dateJP2007018743618.07.2007         Original published format: JP 2007187436
[2018/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009011375
Date:22.01.2009
Language:JA
[2009/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2169594
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2169594
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.01.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077, G06K19/07, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/16, H01Q1/40, B65D75/12, H01Q1/22
[2017/40]
Former International [2010/13]G06K19/077, G06K19/07, H01Q1/38, H01Q9/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2010/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSES IC-BAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2010/13]
English:WIRELESS IC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2010/13]
French:DISPOSITIF À CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ SANS FIL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2010/13]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2009Translation filed 
09.09.2009National basic fee paid 
09.09.2009Search fee paid 
09.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2009Examination requested  [2010/13]
07.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2017
22.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.01.2018Fee for grant paid
29.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.10.2015
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
22.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
24.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
GB17.07.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
MT17.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/23]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
GB17.07.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
FR31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/21]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
GB17.07.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/19]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
IE17.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
LU17.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/13]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/47]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
HR07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
NO07.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[IA]EP1538560  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0051] - [0055]; figure 9 * [A] 14;
 [IA]EP1724714  (NRC INTERNAT INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049]; figures 14-15 * [A] 14;
 [IA]EP1715445  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figure 1 * [A] 14;
 [IA]US2004026519  (USAMI MITSUO [JP], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0150] - [0154] - [ 234] - [0240]; figures 8-9,20 * [A] 14;
 [A]EP0861788  (SMURFIT SOCAR SA [FR]) [A] 14 * figure 5 *;
 [A]DE102006057412  (YEYIN MEHMET [DE]) [A] 14 * figure 2 *
International search[A]JP2004127230  (RENESAS TECH CORP) [A] 1-14 * , Par. Nos. [0061] to [0221]; Figs. 1 to 31 & US 2004-26519 A1 & TW 264785 B & KR 2004-14195 A *;
 [A]JP2004362190  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-14 * , Par. Nos. [0015] to [0039]; Figs. 1 to 9 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008160874  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [A] 1-14 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *
ExaminationUS5854480
 EP1187357
by applicantJP2005244778
 EP1538560
 EP1724714
 EP1715445
 US2004026519
 EP0861788
 DE102006057412