Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2171579

EP2171579 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR EDITING AN ON-DEMAND DATABASE SERVICE GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salesforce.Com, Inc.
The Landmark @ One Market, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/14]For all designated states
Salesforce.Com, Inc.
The Landmark @ One Market, Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WAITE, Andrew
480 Calle Arboleda
Novato, California 94949 / US
02 / CHASMAN, Doug
33 Amber Hill Drive
Pittsford, New York 14534 / US
 [2010/14]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/14]Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date08780246.818.07.2008
[2010/14]
WO2008US08777
Priority number, dateUS20070950824P19.07.2007         Original published format: US 950824 P
US2008017497517.07.2008         Original published format: US 174975
[2010/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009011903
Date:22.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2171579
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009
[2010/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.01.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44
[2011/10]
Former International [2010/14]G06F9/45
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/14]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT ZUM EDITIEREN EINER GRAFISCHEN BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE EINES BEDARFSGESTEUERTEN DATENBANKDIENSTES[2010/14]
English:SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT FOR EDITING AN ON-DEMAND DATABASE SERVICE GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE[2010/14]
French:SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR ÉDITER UNE INTERFACE UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE DE SERVICE DE BASE DE DONNÉES SUR DEMANDE[2010/14]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2010National basic fee paid 
19.01.2010Search fee paid 
19.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
07.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2016
24.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.10.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination23.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0703/17
01.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
03.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
09.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[IY]US6342907  (PETTY DOUGLAS ROBERT [US] ET AL) [I] 1,2,6,8-10,12-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 12 - line 15 * * column 3, line 22 - line 37 * * column 5, line 40 - line 50 * * column 6, line 32 - column 7, line 37 * * column 8, line 60 - column 18, line 62 * * column 19, line 45 - line 60 * * column 20, line 48 - column 21, line 19 * * column 22, line 9 - line 30 * [Y] 3-5,7,11;
 [IY]US2003025732  (PRICHARD SCOT D [US]) [I] 1,3,4,10,12-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 2, paragraph 19 * * page 2, paragraph 29 * * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 3, paragraph 35 * * page 3, paragraph 37 - paragraph 38 * * page 3, paragraph 41 - page 4, paragraph 47; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,5-9,11;
 [IY]US2006206804  (BARNETT JAMES [US]) [I] 1,12-15 * page 1, paragraph 4; figure 2 * * page 2, paragraph 27 - paragraph 30 * * page 2, paragraph 34 * * page 3, paragraph 38 * * page 4, paragraph 46 * * page 4, paragraph 49 - page 4, paragraph 52 * * page 4, paragraph 54 - paragraph 55 * * page 6, paragraph 70; claims 1,2,7,11,13,14 * [Y] 2-11;
 [Y]WO2006119366  (MATHWORKS INC [US]; GRACE ANDREW [US]; MOSTERMAN PIETER J [US]) [Y] 6-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph l * * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph l - page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 2; figures 1A,3,4; claims 1,2,5-7,10,12-16,21-27,32-39 *;
 [Y]  - CUIE ZHAO ET AL, "Database user interface design editor", DATABASE SYSTEMS FOR ADVANCED APPLICATIONS '93. PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRD INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON DATABASE SYSTEMS FOR ADVANCED APPLICATIONS WORLD SCIENTIFIC SINGAPORE, (1993), ISBN 981-02-1380-8, pages 123 - 130, XP002619999 [Y] 8-10 * abstract * * page 123, column l, paragraph l - page 125, column r, paragraph 3; figures 1-6 * * page 127, column l, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 127, column r, paragraph 4 * * page 128, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 130, column l, paragraph 5 - paragraph 7 *
International search[X]US2007088741  ;
 [A]US2006206834