Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2153305

EP2153305 - TOUCHPAD-ENABLED REMOTE CONTROLLER AND USER INTERACTION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
[2015/24]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue
Suite 200
Torrance CA 90503 / US
Former [2010/07]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KRYZE, David
C/o Panasonic San Jose Laboratory
550 South Winchester Blvd.
Suite 400
San Jose, CA 95128 / US
02 / MORIN, Philippe
C/o Panasonic San Jose Laboratory
550South Winchester Blvd.
Suite 400
San Jose, CA 95128 / US
03 / YAMAUCHI, Masaki
c/o Panasonic Corporation
1006 Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP
04 / RIGAZIO, Luca
c/o Panasonic San Jose Laboratory
550 South Winchester Blvd.
Suite 400
San Jose, CA 95128 / US
 [2015/24]
Former [2010/07]01 / KRYZE, David
C/o Panasonic San Jose Laboratory 550 South Winchester Blvd. Suite 400
San Jose, CA 95128 / US
02 / MORIN, Philippe
C/o Panasonic San Jose Laboratory 550South Winchester Blvd. Suite 400
San Jose, CA 95128 / US
03 / YAMAUCHI, Masaki
c/o Panasonic Corporation 1006 Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP
04 / RIGAZIO, Luca
c/o Panasonic San Jose Laboratory 550 South Winchester Blvd. Suite 400
San Jose, CA 95128 / US
Representative(s)Vigand, Philippe , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex - Genève / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/24]Kügele, Bernhard
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
Former [2010/07]Kügele, Bernhard
Novagraaf International SA Avenue du Pailly 25
1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH
Application number, filing date08781028.926.06.2008
[2010/07]
WO2008US68390
Priority number, dateUS20070946804P28.06.2007         Original published format: US 946804 P
US2007097734824.10.2007         Original published format: US 977348
[2010/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009006224
Date:08.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2153305
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009
[2010/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2153305
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.01.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:G08C17/02
[2015/11]
Former International [2010/07]G06F3/041
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2010/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:BERÜHRUNGSFELDAKTIVIERTE FERNSTEUERUNG UND BENUTZERINTERAKTIONSVERFAHREN[2010/07]
English:TOUCHPAD-ENABLED REMOTE CONTROLLER AND USER INTERACTION METHODS[2010/07]
French:CONTRÔLEUR À DISTANCE ACTIVÉ AU MOYEN D'UN PAVÉ TACTILE ET PROCÉDÉS DE DIALOGUE AVEC L'UTILISATEUR[2010/07]
Entry into regional phase02.12.2009National basic fee paid 
02.12.2009Search fee paid 
02.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/07]
23.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2015Fee for grant paid
28.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2015
Opposition(s)11.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.06.2008
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
LU26.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
GB10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
[2018/02]
Former [2017/40]HU26.06.2008
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
GB10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
GB10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/50]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
GB10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/34]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GB10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/24]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/22]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE26.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/18]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2016/08]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1615202  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0075] *;
 [A]US2005243061  (LIBERTY MATTHEW G [US] ET AL) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 2-12 *
International search[X]US2006197753  ;
 [Y]USRE39059E  ;
 [Y]US6407779