Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2170452

EP2170452 - BALLOON CATHETER WITH DEFLATION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.2013
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
[2012/04]
Former [2011/43]For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
P.O. Box 2269
Bloomington, IN 47402 / US
Former [2010/14]For all designated states
Wilson-Cook Medical Inc.
4900 Bethania Station Road PO Box 27115-4191
Winston-Salem, NC 27105-4191 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CARTER, Matthew, P.
127 Smith Farm Trail
Dobson, NC 27107 / US
02 / KENNEDY, Kenneth, C., II
c/o Cook Ireland Ltd.
O'Halloran Road, National Technology Park
Limerick / IE
 [2013/07]
Former [2010/25]01 / CARTER, Matthew, P.
127 Smith Farm Trail
Dobson, NC 27107 / US
02 / KENNEDY, Kenneth, C., II
c/o Cook Ireland Ltd. O'Halloran Road, National Technology Park
Limerick / IE
Former [2010/14]01 / CARTER, Matthew, P.
127 Smith Farm Trail
Dobson, NC 27107 / US
02 / KENNEDY, Kenneth, C., II
2021 Elkmont Court
Clemmons, NC 27012 / US
Representative(s)Garratt, Peter Douglas , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/14]Garratt, Peter Douglas , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date08781427.307.07.2008
[2010/14]
WO2008US69306
Priority number, dateUS20070958819P09.07.2007         Original published format: US 958819 P
[2010/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009009474
Date:15.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2170452
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2009
[2010/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2170452
Date:13.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/10
[2010/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/14]
TitleGerman:BALLONKATHETER MIT DEFLATIONSMECHANISMUS[2010/14]
English:BALLOON CATHETER WITH DEFLATION MECHANISM[2010/14]
French:CATHÉTER À BALLONNET AVEC MÉCANISME DE DÉGONFLAGE[2010/14]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2010National basic fee paid 
14.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/14]
16.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2012Fee for grant paid
20.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2011
Opposition(s)14.11.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.07.2008
AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CY13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
IT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
MT13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
TR13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
LU07.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CY13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
IT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
MT13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
TR13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2015/30]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CY13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
IT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/24]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
IT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
FR31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
IT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
IT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
MC13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2014/03]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
IT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/49]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
CZ13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
RO13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
SK13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/48]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
DK13.02.2013
EE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
NL13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/41]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
HR13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/40]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
PT13.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT13.02.2013
BE13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
LV13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT13.02.2013
FI13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
SI13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
GR14.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT13.02.2013
LT13.02.2013
PL13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
ES24.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT13.02.2013
SE13.02.2013
BG13.05.2013
NO13.05.2013
IS13.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT13.02.2013
NO13.05.2013
Cited inInternational search[DXA]US2004236366  (KENNEDY KENNETH C [US] ET AL) [DX] 1-4,8-14,16,17,20,21 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 1, paragraph 9; figures 5A-5D * * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 2, paragraph 19 * * page 3, paragraph 32 - page 3, paragraph 34; figure 1 * * page 4, paragraph 39 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - page 6, paragraph 65; figures 4,6-8 * * claims 1-25 * [A] 7;
 [X]WO2007054364  (ABBOTT LAB VASCULAR ENTPR LTD [IE]; PAGEL CHRISTINE [DE]; SEEGER DOREE) [X] 1,3,4,10,19-21 * page 1, line 15 - page 1, line 18 * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 4; figure 1 * * page 4, line 4 - page 8, line 23; figures 2-10 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 10; figure 15 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 9 *;
 [XA]WO9215360  (PROGRESSIVE ANGIOPLASTY SYSTEM [US]) [X] 1,3-6,10,19-21 * page 1, line 4 - page 1, line 7 * * page 3, line 2 - page 3, line 31 * * page 5, line 2 - page 6, line 5; figures 1,2 * * page 7, line 6 - page 10, line 3; figures 1,2,5,6 * [A] 14-18;
 [PX]US2007276426  (EUTENEUER CHARLES LOUIS [US]) [PX] 1-6,10-12,14-21 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 8, paragraph 66 - page 9, paragraph 71; figures 6-7C *;
 [X]US5423755  (KESTEN RANDY J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,10-12,19-21 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 7 * * page 2 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 51; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 33 *;
 [A]US2001001114  (TSUGITA ROSS S [US] ET AL) [A] 1,20 * page 11, paragraph 116 - page 11, paragraph 118; figures 44-46B *