Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2009018016

WO2009018016 - SOLAR HEAT MANAGEMENT IN PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEMS USING PHASE CHANGE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2010
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.08.2010  [2010/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DOW Global Technologies, Inc.
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / MAZOR, Michael, M.
1214 Foxwood Drive
Midland, MI 48642 / US
02 / ELLERBRACHT, Steven, R.
5400 Siebert
Midland, MI 48642 / US
03 / CLEEREMAN, Robert, J.
5908 Wimbledon Court
Midland, MI 48642 / US
04 / HOWARD, Kevin, E.
1015 Whispering Oak Drive
Midland, MI 48642 / US
[N/P]
Application number, filing date08782191.422.07.2008
WO2008US70762
Priority number, dateUS20070952803P30.07.2007         Original published format: US 952803 P
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009018016
Date:05.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/048, H01L31/052, H01L31/045
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR 
TitleEnglish:SOLAR HEAT MANAGEMENT IN PHOTOVOLTAIC SYSTEMS USING PHASE CHANGE MATERIALS
French:GESTION DE LA CHALEUR SOLAIRE DANS DES SYSTÈMES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES EN UTILISANT DES MATÉRIAUX À CHANGEMENT DE PHASE
Examination procedure02.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/34]
08.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2010/34]
Cited inInternational search[X]US2007144574  (YADA NAOYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-7,10-12,17-28 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] - [0038] , [0039] , [0089] - [0108]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]JPS6245080  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN; NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD; HOXAN KK KOGYO GI) [X] 1,4-7,10,17,20,21,28 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH11108467  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,10,17,28,33 * paragraphs [0003] - [0024]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4389533  (AMES DOUGLAS A [US]) [X] 1,4-10,17,18,20,21,28,31,32 * abstract * * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 16; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4322737  (SLIWA JR JOHN W) [X] 1-3,10,17,19,28 * column 8, line 40 - column 11, line 15; figures 10-14 *;
 [X]US5505788  (DINWOODIE THOMAS L [US]) [X] 1,10-17,22-30 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 50 * * column 11, lines 37-67; figures 3a-d,7a-c *;
 [A]JPS5882578  (MORI TAKASHI) [A] 1,4-6,10,16,28,30 * the whole document *