Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: WO2009018016 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   WO2009018016



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 117
20.07.2010 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
08.04.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 4
17.02.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
09.12.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.04.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
09.04.2009 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
26.02.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 48
13.02.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
13.02.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
13.02.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
05.02.2009 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 42