Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2181330

EP2181330 - COMPOSITIONS AND MEANS FOR DIAGNOSING MICROBIAL INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 31.08.2016  [2016/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Statens Serum Institut
Artillerivej 5
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[2013/31]
Former [2011/35]For all designated states
Statens Serum Institut
Orestads Boulevard 5
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
Former [2010/18]For all designated states
Statens Serum Institut
Artillerivej 5
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
Inventor(s)01 / FRIMODT-MOLLER, Niels
Baunegaardsvej 44
DK-2820 Gentofte / DK
 [2010/18]
Representative(s)Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/35]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2012/48]Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2010/18]Maggs, Michael Norman , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date08784426.226.08.2008
[2010/18]
WO2008DK00303
Priority number, dateEP2007011548031.08.2007         Original published format: EP 07115480
US20070969260P31.08.2007         Original published format: US 969260 P
[2010/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009026920
Date:05.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2181330
Date:05.05.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009
[2010/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2181330
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2181330
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/04, C12Q1/14, C12M1/16, C12M1/20, C12Q1/08
[2013/01]
Former International [2010/18]G01N33/52, G01N33/543, C12Q1/08, C12M1/16, C12M1/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/35]
Former [2010/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND MITTEL ZUR DIAGNOSE MIKROBIELLER INFEKTIONEN[2010/18]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND MEANS FOR DIAGNOSING MICROBIAL INFECTIONS[2010/18]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET MOYENS PERMETTANT DE DIAGNOSTIQUER DES INFECTIONS MICROBIENNES[2010/18]
Entry into regional phase08.02.2010National basic fee paid 
08.02.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
08.02.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/18]
21.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2013Fee for grant paid
27.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Biomérieux
69280 Marcy L'Etoile / FR
Opponent's representative
Morel, Anne-Aurore
BioMérieux
Chemin de l'Orme
69280 Marcy l'Etoile / FR
 [2014/37]
29.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.11.2015
16.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.01.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.04.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.07.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
[2016/31]
Former [2016/28]MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2015/18]MC20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/23]IS20.03.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004050675  (TAINTOR READ ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-66 * page 1, lines 19-21 * * pages 6,7 * * page 8, line 305 - page 10, line 376 * * page 13, lines 385-387 * * pages 16,17 * * pages 21,24 * * page 24, lines 856-858 * * claims 1-21 * * figures 1,2,5,17-19,25-39 *;
 [X]WO03106696  (IDEXX LAB INC [US]; CHEN CHUN-MING [US]; CARPENTER CHARLES R [US]; GU) [X] 1-66 * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 31 * * pages 12,14,15 * * claims 1-33 *;
 [X]US2002076742  (CHEN CHUN-MING [US] ET AL) [X] 1-66 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0009] , [0013] - [0016] - [0045] - [0060]; claims 1-19 *;
 [X]US6251624  (MATSUMURA PAUL M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-66 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6750038  (NAKANE PAUL K [US]) [X] 1-66 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - RODRIGUEZ T ET AL, "Standardization of Neisseria meningitidis serogroup B colorimetric serum bactericidal assay", CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC LABORATORY IMMUNOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200201), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1071-412X, pages 109 - 114, XP003009515 [A] 1-66 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CDLI.9.1.109-114.2002
ExaminationUS6350588