Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2180955

EP2180955 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING OVERSPRAY OF A LIQUID COATING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.08.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
27.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dürr Systems AG
Carl-Benz-Straße 34
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
[2017/06]
Former [2010/18]For all designated states
Dürr Systems GmbH
Carl-Benz-Str. 34
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FRITZ, Hans-Georg
Schönbuchstrasse 4
73760 Ostfildern / DE
02 / HOLZHEIMER, Jens
Alleenstrasse 88
71732 Tamm / DE
03 / WIELAND, Dietmar
Im Raisger 32
71336 Waiblingen / DE
 [2010/18]
Representative(s)Heusler, Wolfgang
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/36]Heusler, Wolfgang
v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Former [2010/18]Heusler, Wolfgang
v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Application number, filing date08784920.421.07.2008
[2010/18]
WO2008EP05954
Priority number, dateDE2007104015324.08.2007         Original published format: DE102007040153
[2010/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009026995
Date:05.03.2009
Language:DE
[2009/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2180955
Date:05.05.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009
[2010/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2180955
Date:07.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:B05B15/12
[2010/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/18]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSCHEIDEN VON OVERSPRAY EINES FLÜSSIGEN BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALS[2010/18]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING OVERSPRAY OF A LIQUID COATING MATERIAL[2010/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR EXTRAIRE L'EXCÈS DE PROJECTION D'UN MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT LIQUIDE[2010/18]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2010National basic fee paid 
05.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/18]
09.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2011Fee for grant paid
27.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11006179.3  / EP2383048
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.06.2012  10.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Eisenmann SE
Tübinger Strasse 81
71032 Böblingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Epplestraße 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
 [2017/32]
Former [2016/46]
Opponent(s)01  05.06.2012  10.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Eisenmann SE
Tübinger Strasse 81
71032 Böblingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Heinrich, Hanjo, et al
Ostertag & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Epplestraße 14
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2012/29]
Opponent(s)01  05.06.2012   
Eisenmann AG
Tübinger Strasse 81
71032 Böblingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Heinrich, Hanjo, et al
Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte Epplestraße 14
D-70597 Stuttgart / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
13.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
22.03.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition12.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1222/16
01.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
22.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.07.2008
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
GB21.07.2012
LU21.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
AT21.07.2013
[2014/51]
Former [2014/34]HU21.07.2008
CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
GB21.07.2012
LU21.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2014/27]CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
GB21.07.2012
LU21.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2014/21]CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
TR07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
GB21.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/35]CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
MT07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
GB21.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/29]CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
DK07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
BG07.12.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
ES18.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
GB21.07.2012
BE31.07.2012
CH31.07.2012
LI31.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2012/23]CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
EE07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
IT07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
NL07.09.2011
RO07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
PT09.01.2012
Former [2012/21]CY07.09.2011
CZ07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
IS07.01.2012
Former [2012/20]CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
IE07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
Former [2012/13]CY07.09.2011
FI07.09.2011
HR07.09.2011
LT07.09.2011
LV07.09.2011
SE07.09.2011
SI07.09.2011
NO07.12.2011
GR08.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]DE102005048579  (DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,15 * the whole document *;
 [DX]DE102005013710  (DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1,15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1427536
 WO2004087331
 DE10130173
 JPH02123025
 JPH06278868
 WO2008EP05961