Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2191014

EP2191014 - IVIG MODULATION OF CHEMOKINES FOR TREATMENT OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, AND PARKINSON'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
[2010/22]
Inventor(s)01 / REIPERT, Birgit
Heinegasse 2
AT-2232 Deutsch Wagram / AT
02 / EHRLICH, Hartmut
Dr. Heinrich-Maier-Strasse 20/1
AT-1180 Vienna / AT
03 / SCHWARZ, Hans-Peter
Poetzleinsdorfer Strasse 50/9/2
A-1180 Vienna / AT
04 / ELOVAARA, Irina
Varalankatu 4-6 A 2
FI-33240 Tampere / FI
 [2010/22]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/14]Bassett, Richard Simon
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2010/22]Bassett, Richard Simon
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date08785488.111.08.2008
[2010/22]
WO2008EP06608
Priority number, dateUS20070955610P13.08.2007         Original published format: US 955610 P
[2010/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009021708
Date:19.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2191014
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009
[2010/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2191014
Date:03.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2010/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/22]
Extension statesAL12.03.2010
BA12.03.2010
MK12.03.2010
RS12.03.2010
TitleGerman:IVIG-MODULATION VON CHEMOKINEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MULTIPLER SKLEROSE, MORBUS ALZHEIMER UND MORBUS PARKINSON[2010/22]
English:IVIG MODULATION OF CHEMOKINES FOR TREATMENT OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, AND PARKINSON'S DISEASE[2010/22]
French:MODULATION PAR DES IMMUNOGLOBULINES INTRAVEINEUSES (IVIG) DE CHIMIOKINES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUES, DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER ET DE LA MALADIE DE PARKINSON[2010/22]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2010National basic fee paid 
12.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
10.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.02.2012Date of oral proceedings
08.03.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2013Fee for grant paid
19.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12179736.9  / EP2522752
EP12179739.3  / EP2522753
EP12179740.1  / EP2522754
EP12179743.5  / EP2522755
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.08.2010
Opposition(s)06.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.08.2008
BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
LU11.08.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
MT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
TR03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/20]BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
MC03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/11]BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
CZ03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
RO03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
SK03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2014/09]BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
DK03.04.2013
EE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/52]BE03.04.2013
CY03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/51]BE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
HR03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/50]BE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
LV03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
PL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
BG03.07.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/49]BE03.04.2013
FI03.04.2013
LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SE03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
GR04.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/48]LT03.04.2013
NL03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
IS03.08.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT03.04.2013
SI03.04.2013
NO03.07.2013
PT05.08.2013
Former [2013/37]SI03.04.2013
Cited inInternational search[A]WO02059604  (OXFORD GLYCOSCIENCES UK LTD [GB]; HERATH HERATH MUDIYANSELAGE AT [GB];) [A] 1-10,13-21 * page 1, lines 7-10 * * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005027733  (SURROMED INC [US]; KANTOR AARON B [US]; BECKER CHRISTOPHER H [US] PPD) [A] 1-10,13-21 * paragraph [0066] * * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006077126  (SCHERING AG [DE]; ZIPP-NITSCH FRAUKE [DE]; INFANTE-DUARTE CARMEN [DE];) [A] 1-10,13-21 * paragraph [0001] * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006003327  (ACHIRON ANAT [IL] ET AL) [A] 1-10,13-21 * paragraph [0079] * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004053251  (PERICAK-VANCE MARGARET A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10,13-21 * paragraphs [0004] , [0036] * * table 5 * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006183117  (PERICAK-VANCE MARGARET A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10,13-21 * paragraphs [0011] , [0015] * * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004014109  (PERICAK-VANCE MARGARET A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10,13-21 * claim 1 * * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005067391  (TECHNION RES & DEV FOUNDATION [IL]; YOUDIM MOUSSA B H [IL]; MANDEL SIL) [A] 1-10,13-21 * page 6, lines 10-14 *
by applicant   - WILMS ET AL., CURR. PHARM. DES., (2007), vol. 13, page 1925
    - YAMAMOTO ET AL., AM. J. PATHOLOGY, (2006), vol. 166, page 1475
    - HUANG ET AL., FASEB, (2005), vol. 19, page 761
    - KIM ET AL., EXP. AND MOL. MED., (2006), vol. 38, page 333