Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2185662

EP2185662 - PHOTOACTIVE TIO2 IN COATING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.01.2016
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/20]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SEEBER, Alexandra
Schwetzinger Strasse 67
68165 Mannheim / DE
02 / SCHINDLER, Götz-Peter
Christoph-Kröwerath-Strasse 64
67071 Ludwigshafen / DE
03 / FREITAG, Katrin
Lindenstrasse 18
67065 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / JAHNS, Ekkehard
Wintergasse 19/2
69469 Weinheim / DE
05 / RAFFAELE ADDAMO, Antonino
3. Gartenweg 40
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
06 / KLEINE JAEGER, Frank
Birkental 25
67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE
07 / KLINGLER, Dirk
Meerfeldstrasse 41
68163 Mannheim / DE
 [2010/20]
Representative(s)Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/52]Steinbusch, Daniel
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
EASTSITE ONE
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2010/36](deleted)
...
Former [2010/20]Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan , et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Grafenberger Allee 342
40235 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date08787515.927.08.2008
[2010/20]
WO2008EP61220
Priority number, dateEP2007011510728.08.2007         Original published format: EP 07115107
[2010/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009027432
Date:05.03.2009
Language:DE
[2009/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2185662
Date:19.05.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009
[2010/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2185662
Date:22.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:C09D7/00, C09D7/12
[2010/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/20]
TitleGerman:PHOTOAKTIVES TIO2 IN BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALIEN[2010/20]
English:PHOTOACTIVE TIO2 IN COATING MATERIALS[2010/20]
French:TIO2 PHOTOACTIF DANS DES MATÉRIAUX DE REVÊTEMENT[2010/20]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2010National basic fee paid 
29.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/20]
12.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2010Fee for grant paid
28.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.09.2011  26.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Postfach 10 07 20
D-51307 Leverkusen / DE
 02  21.09.2011  26.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Sachtleben Chemie GmbH
Dr. Rudolf Sachtleben Strasse 4
47198 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nobbe, Matthias, et al
Demski & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Mülheimer Strasse 210
47057 Duisburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2011/43]
Opponent(s)01  20.09.2011   
KRONOS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Postfach 10 07 20
D-51307 Leverkusen / DE
 02  21.09.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Sachtleben Chemie GmbH
Dr. Rudolf Sachtleben Strasse 4
47198 Duisburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Nobbe, Matthias
Demski, Frank & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Reichspräsidentenstraße 21-25
45470 Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE
02.12.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.04.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.11.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.10.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/08]
Appeal following opposition16.01.2014Appeal received No.  T0164/14
11.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
19.10.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
19.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
HU22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
NO22.03.2011
IS22.04.2011
LU27.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GR02.03.2012
PT28.05.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
AT27.08.2013
IT27.08.2015
[2016/21]
Former [2014/51]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
HU22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
NO22.03.2011
IS22.04.2011
LU27.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GR02.03.2012
PT28.05.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
AT27.08.2013
Former [2014/34]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
HU22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
RO22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
NO22.03.2011
IS22.04.2011
LU27.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GR02.03.2012
PT28.05.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
Former [2013/45]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
HU22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
NO22.03.2011
IS22.04.2011
LU27.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GR02.03.2012
PT28.05.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
Former [2013/44]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
DK22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
IE22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
MT22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
TR22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
NO22.03.2011
IS22.04.2011
LU27.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GR02.03.2012
PT28.05.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
Former [2011/36]CY22.12.2010
CZ22.12.2010
EE22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
PL22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
SK22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
NO22.03.2011
IS22.04.2011
Former [2011/34]CY22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
NO22.03.2011
Former [2011/29]CY22.12.2010
FI22.12.2010
HR22.12.2010
LT22.12.2010
LV22.12.2010
SE22.12.2010
SI22.12.2010
BG22.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007069596  ;
 [X]JP2005028575  ;
 [X]WO9901766  (UNIV UTRECHT [NL]) [X] 1-11 * examples 1-15; claims 1-32 *;
 [DX]JP2006233343
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 64, Database accession no. 2007-689318, XP002501462 & WO2007069596 A 20070621 (ASAHI KASEI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-11 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 15, Database accession no. 2005-135623, XP002501463 & JP2005028575 A 20050203 (DOKURITSU GYOSEI HOJIN BUSSHITSU ZAIRYO) [X] 1-11 * abstract *
 [DX]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 65, Database accession no. 2006-624086, XP002501464 & JP2006233343 A 20060907 (NIPPON SODA CO) [DX] 1-11 * abstract *
by applicantJPH11228873
 WO2005100459
 EP0956041
 JP2005028575
 WO9901766