Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2185662 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2185662



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1140
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
20.01.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
23.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.12.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.12.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
07.12.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.12.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.12.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
23.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
23.10.2015 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
19.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.07.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
01.07.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
30.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
30.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 2
30.06.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
22.06.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.06.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.06.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.06.2015 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.02.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.07.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
01.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.06.2014 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 13
24.06.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 2
24.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.03.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
13.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
13.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Claims Appeal 4
13.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Claims Appeal 2
13.03.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
11.03.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 42
29.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
29.01.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
23.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
20.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.01.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
15.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
07.11.2013 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
07.11.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
07.11.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
07.11.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.10.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.10.2013 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
14.10.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2013 Claims Opposition 4
26.08.2013 Claims Opposition 4
26.08.2013 Claims Opposition 5
26.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
22.08.2013 Claims Opposition 2
22.08.2013 Claims Opposition 3
22.08.2013 Claims Opposition 2
22.08.2013 Claims Opposition 4
22.08.2013 Claims Opposition 2
22.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 12
19.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.08.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.08.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
25.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.01.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.12.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.12.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.12.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.11.2012 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
26.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
21.11.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
21.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
21.09.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.08.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
03.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
03.08.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
07.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.04.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2012 Claims Opposition 2
16.04.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
12.04.2012 Claims Opposition 1
12.04.2012 Description Opposition 1
12.04.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
02.12.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
02.12.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
02.12.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
29.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.11.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
25.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.09.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
21.09.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
21.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
21.09.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
21.09.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 52
20.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 48
20.09.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 57
25.11.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.10.2010 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.10.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
28.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.07.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.07.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.07.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
08.07.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.07.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
27.05.2010 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
17.05.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
17.05.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
17.05.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.05.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
12.05.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
12.05.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
06.05.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
06.05.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
28.04.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.04.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.04.2010 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
26.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
10.03.2010 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
10.03.2010 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
21.01.2010 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
21.01.2010 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
11.01.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.11.2009 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
09.11.2009 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
26.03.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
18.03.2009 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
05.03.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
05.03.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 26
02.03.2009 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.03.2009 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.03.2009 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2009 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2009 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2009 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.03.2009 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.03.2009 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.02.2009 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.02.2009 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.12.2008 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
18.12.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.12.2008 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.12.2008 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
31.10.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
31.10.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
31.10.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
27.08.2008 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
27.08.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
27.08.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
27.08.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 23