Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2150930

EP2150930 - METHOD AND SYSTEM MAKING IT POSSIBLE TO PLACE AN INDIVIDUAL PUBLIC VEHICLE AT THE DISPOSAL OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vu Log
21 Avenue Simone Veil
06200 Nice / FR
[2017/07]
Former [2010/06]For all designated states
Vu Log
12bis Boulevard Wilson
06600 Antibes / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GALLAIS, Georges, Bernard, Marie, Paul, Antoine
818 Route de Grasse
F-06600 Antibes / FR
02 / EMSELLEM, David, Serge, Ange, André
1645 Avenue Jules Grec
06600 Antibes / FR
03 / GIBORY, David, Pierre, Marie
4 Rue Pasteur
F-06600 Antibes / FR
 [2010/13]
Former [2010/06]01 / GALLAIS, Georges, Bernard, Marie, Paul, Antoine
818 Route de Grasse
F-06600 Antibes / FR
02 / EMSELLEM, David, Serge, Ange, André
7 Avenue Auguste Renoir
F-06600 Antibes / FR
03 / GIBORY, David, Pierre, Marie
4 Rue Pasteur
F-06600 Antibes / FR
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/06]de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick
Murgitroyd & Company, Immeuble Atlantis 55, Allée Pierre Ziller, Sophia Antipolis
06560 Valbonne / FR
Application number, filing date08787925.008.04.2008
[2010/06]
WO2008FR00490
Priority number, dateFR2007000313930.04.2007         Original published format: FR 0703139
FR2007000411708.06.2007         Original published format: FR 0704117
[2010/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008145833
Date:04.12.2008
Language:FR
[2008/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2150930
Date:10.02.2010
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008
[2010/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G07C5/00, G07B15/00
[2010/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/06]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DER POSITIONIERUNG EINES EINZELNEN ÖFFENTLICHEN FAHRZEUGS ENTSPRECHEND DER FESTLEGUNG EINES BENUTZERS[2010/06]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM MAKING IT POSSIBLE TO PLACE AN INDIVIDUAL PUBLIC VEHICLE AT THE DISPOSAL OF A USER[2010/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE METTRE UN VÉHICULE PUBLIC INDIVIDUEL À LA DISPOSITION D'UN UTILISATEUR[2010/06]
Entry into regional phase18.11.2009National basic fee paid 
18.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
18.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/06]
15.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2010Invitation to provide information on prior art
23.07.2010Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art
15.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
07.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination03.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0897/17
16.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.01.2016Request for further processing filed
04.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.02.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
15.03.2011Request for further processing filed
15.03.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.03.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
06.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201912   M06   Fee paid on   06.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1398719  (SWISSCOM AG [CH]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]EP1498855  (EUROPCAR AUTOVERMIETUNG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0034] *;
 [A]FR2801994  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2819958  (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - SOPHIE RAMBURE, "Des voitures électriques en libre service dès 2007", NICE MATIN, (20060801), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.avem.fr/img/news/2006/vulog04.jpg, (20080312), XP002472475 [X] 1-13 * page 1 - page 1 *
 [X]  - GEORGES GALLAIS, "A CAR - ANYWHERE, ANYTIME!", INÉDIT, The newsletter of INRIA, no. 58, (200703), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.inria.fr/actualites///inedit/pdf/inedit58.en.pdf, (20080312), XP002472476 [X] 1-13 * page 5 *
 [X]  - AVENIR DU VEHICULE ELECTRIQUE MEDITERRANEEN (AVEM), "Véhicules électriques en libre service pour le centre Ville d'Antibes", (20060804), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.avem.fr/news.php?id=065, (20080312), XP002472477 [X] 1-13 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 1 - page 2 *
 [X]  - COMMUNICATION ANTIBES VILLES, "En 2007, Antibes Juan-les-Pins expérimente la voiture électrique", INFOS MAG, no. 53, (200611), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://vulog.com/citevu/press/CommunicationAntibesvilleseptembre2006.PDF, (20080312), XP002472478 [X] 1-13 * page 1 *