blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2152500

EP2152500 - COMPOSITE LAY-UP HEAD WITH A RETRACTABLE DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A PREPREG FROM ITS SUPPORT TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forest-Line Capdenac
20 Rue de L'Arc de Triomphe
75017 Paris / FR
[2010/07]
Inventor(s)01 / TILLEMENT, Pierre, André, Henri
40, Avenue Léo Lagrange
F-12300 Decazeville / FR
02 / CHARRA, Stéphane, Robert, Elie
10 rue Marcel Pagnol
F-46100 Figeac / FR
 [2010/14]
Former [2010/07]01 / TILLEMENT, Pierre, André, Henri
40, Avenue Léo Lagrange
F-12300 Decazeville / FR
02 / CHARRA, Stéphane, Robert, Elie
14, Boulevard Juskiewenski
F-46100 Figeac / FR
Representative(s)Bertrand, Didier, et al
Fédit-Loriot
38, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/07]Bertrand, Didier, et al
S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date08787928.409.04.2008
[2010/07]
WO2008FR00493
Priority number, dateFR2007000322204.05.2007         Original published format: FR 0703222
[2010/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008142273
Date:27.11.2008
Language:FR
[2008/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2152500
Date:17.02.2010
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2152500
Date:23.02.2011
Language:FR
[2011/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.2009
ClassificationIPC:B29C70/38
[2010/07]
CPC:
B29C70/388 (EP,US); B29C70/545 (EP,US); B29C2793/0027 (EP);
Y10T156/1707 (EP,US); Y10T156/171 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/07]
TitleGerman:VERBUNDAUFLAGEKOPF MIT AUSZIEHBARER VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG EINES PREPREGS VON SEINEM TRÄGERBAND[2010/07]
English:COMPOSITE LAY-UP HEAD WITH A RETRACTABLE DEVICE FOR SEPARATING A PREPREG FROM ITS SUPPORT TAPE[2010/07]
French:TÊTE DE DRAPAGE DE COMPOSITE AVEC DISPOSITIF ESCAMOTABLE DE SÉPARATION DE PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ DE SON RUBAN DE SUPPORT[2010/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2009National basic fee paid 
04.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/07]
20.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2011Fee for grant paid
13.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
HU23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
TR23.02.2011
LU09.04.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
TR23.02.2011
LU09.04.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2013/33]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
IS23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
LU09.04.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2013/25]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
LU09.04.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2012/13]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
PL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BE30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2012/05]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
MT23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/51]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/50]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
PL20.07.2011
Former [2011/49]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
CZ23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
RO23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
SK23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/47]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
DK23.02.2011
EE23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
IE23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/38]AT23.02.2011
CY23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
NL23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY23.02.2011
FI23.02.2011
HR23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
SI23.02.2011
BG23.05.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Former [2011/36]HR23.02.2011
LT23.02.2011
LV23.02.2011
SE23.02.2011
NO23.05.2011
GR24.05.2011
PT23.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0144927  (CINCINNATI MILACRON INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 8 - line 30 * * page 7, line 16 - page 9, line 17 ** figures 1-5 *;
 [DA]US4842684  (TILLEMENT PIERRE [FR], et al) [DA] 1-9 * figures 3,4 * * column 2, line 11 - line 15 *;
 [DA]US5314563  (GRIMSHAW MICHAEL N [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * figures 15-17 *;
 [DA]FR2888156  (FOREST LINE CAPDENAC SOC PAR A [FR]) [DA] 1-9 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.