blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2173838

EP2173838 - USE OF A DISPERSANT TO IMPROVE OXIDATION STABILITY OF A FUEL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/15]FUEL OIL COMPOSITIONS AND ADDITIVES THEREFOR
[2012/23]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.10.2022
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2022Revocation of patentpublished on 30.11.2022  [2022/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innospec Limited
Innospec Manufacturing Park Oil Sites Road Ellesmere Port
Cheshire CH65 4EY / GB
[2010/15]
Inventor(s)01 / REID, Jacqueline
Cheshire View
Stonehill Barns
Cymau Lane
Cyhmau Flintshire LL12 9TQ / GB
 [2012/43]
Former [2010/15]01 / REID, Jacqueline
Cheshire View Stonehill Barns Cymau Lane
Cyhmau Flintshire LL12 9TQ / GB
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Delaney, Jennifer
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax
HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2010/15]Delaney, Jennifer
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date08788601.625.07.2008
[2010/15]
WO2008GB50626
Priority number, dateGB2007001472528.07.2007         Original published format: GB 0714725
[2010/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009016400
Date:05.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2173838
Date:14.04.2010
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2173838
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.2009
ClassificationIPC:C10L1/14, C10L1/224, C10L1/22, C10L10/18
[2010/15]
CPC:
C10L1/026 (EP,KR); C10L1/221 (EP,KR); C10L1/14 (EP);
C10L1/1832 (EP,KR); C10L1/19 (EP,KR); C10L1/22 (EP);
C10L1/238 (EP,KR); C10L10/18 (EP,KR); C10L1/183 (EP);
C10L1/2383 (EP); C10L1/2387 (EP); C10L2230/081 (KR);
Y02E50/10 (EP); Y02P30/20 (KR); Y02T50/678 (EP,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/15]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES DISPERGIERMITTELS ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER OXIDATIONSSTABILITÄT EINER TREIBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2012/23]
English:USE OF A DISPERSANT TO IMPROVE OXIDATION STABILITY OF A FUEL COMPOSITION[2012/23]
French:UTILISATION D' UN DISPERSANT POUR AMÉLIORER LA STABILITÉ OXYDANTE D'UN CARBURANT[2012/23]
Former [2010/15]HEIZÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ZUSÄTZE DAFÜR
Former [2010/15]FUEL OIL COMPOSITIONS AND ADDITIVES THEREFOR
Former [2010/15]COMPOSITIONS DE FIOUL ET ADDITIFS POUR CES DERNIÈRES
Entry into regional phase28.01.2010National basic fee paid 
28.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/15]
18.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.05.2012
10.05.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
25.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2012Fee for grant paid
10.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10196654.7  / EP2302020
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.07.2013  29.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Afton Chemical Corporation
500 Spring Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2017/28]
Opponent(s)01  24.07.2013  29.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Afton Chemical Corporation
500 Spring Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2013/35]
Opponent(s)01  24.07.2013   
Afton Chemical Corporation
500 Spring Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
29.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.04.2022Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2022
31.05.2022Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2022Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
25.07.2022Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/48]
Appeal following opposition25.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0222/16
23.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2021Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
09.07.2021Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.07.2008
AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE25.07.2013
LU25.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
MT24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
TR24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE25.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/36]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE25.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
IE25.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
MC24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CY24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
IT24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
RO24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
CZ24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
EE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
SK24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
DK24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
BG24.01.2013
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT24.10.2012
BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
PT25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
SI24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/24]BE24.10.2012
FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
GR25.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/23]FI24.10.2012
HR24.10.2012
LV24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
PL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI24.10.2012
NL24.10.2012
SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
ES04.02.2013
IS24.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE24.10.2012
NO24.01.2013
Former [2013/20]NO24.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0203692  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-17 * page 7, columns 11,12; example 1; claims 1,2,4-7,11,12 *;
 [XY]US5049293  (BLAIN DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * column 1, line 10 - line 17; examples 1-3 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 11; claims 1-3 * [Y] 2,7-17;
 [Y]US5468262  (ACKER WILLIAM P [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 60; claims 5-8 *;
 [X]US2005223627  (EYDOUX FRANK [FR], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0009] - [0020] , [0023] - [0040] - [0048] , [0052] , [0098] - [0109] - [0114]; examples 1,2; claims 30,40-42,56,57,68,70,72,76; tables 3,4 *;
 [XP]EP1847583  (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-17 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0037]; claims 1-5; tables 2,3 *;
 [XP]WO2008049822  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [XP] 1-17 * page 2, line 1 - line 29 * * page 6, line 16 - page 8, line 11 * * page 9, line 1 - line 14 * * page 9, line 38 - page 11, line 42 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 12 ** page 14 - page 15 *
ExaminationWO2008124390
by applicantUS5049293
 US2005223627
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.