blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2293850 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2293850



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 397
14.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.12.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.11.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.11.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.08.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.08.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.08.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.08.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
08.08.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 35
05.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 Description Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
05.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.06.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.06.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 35
25.06.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 35
01.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
01.08.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
01.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.08.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.04.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
07.04.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
22.04.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
22.04.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 9
22.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
22.04.2016 Description Search / examination 9
22.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
21.01.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.07.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
12.07.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
12.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.07.2013 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.05.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.05.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.05.2013 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.10.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.10.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
03.08.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
05.04.2011 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
30.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
30.03.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
30.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.02.2011 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.02.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
16.02.2011 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.11.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
19.11.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.09.2010 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
10.09.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.09.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
22.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.07.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
02.02.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
14.01.2010 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 38
19.09.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.09.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 3
19.09.2008 Description International Searching Authority 34
19.09.2008 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1