blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2293850


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.11.2018 (Expected) grant published on  02.01.2019  [2019/01]
27.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.11.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
07.08.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.07.2018 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.06.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.05.2018 Change - classification published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
18.05.2018 Change - classification published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
02.08.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.04.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.07.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.06.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.05.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.01.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.01.2013 First examination report
26.10.2012 Change - representative published on  28.11.2012  [2012/48]
08.04.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.08.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
31.08.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.08.2011 Change - extension states published on  21.09.2011  [2011/38]
01.08.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
01.04.2011 Amendment by applicant
08.03.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
08.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.02.2011 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
11.02.2011 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.03.2011  [2011/11]
11.02.2011 Request for examination filed published on  16.03.2011  [2011/11]
10.01.2011 PCT data prior to European publication
13.12.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
10.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
29.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
15.01.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.2008 PCT data prior to European publication