blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2293850 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP00941642 EP00977109 EP00977110 EP01950570 EP02794371 EP03796993 EP06751298 EP08789160 EP10171585 EP10173204

More

EP13151885 EP97946946 EP99963959 EP99965026



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2007111616Global Dossier 04.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2004054531Global Dossier 01.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2004054529Global Dossier 01.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9822079Global Dossier 28.05.1998A1
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0202128Global Dossier 25.04.2002A3
WO0202128 10.01.2002A2
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0156399Global Dossier 09.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0139606Global Dossier 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0134108Global Dossier 17.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0134107Global Dossier 17.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0032160Global Dossier 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO0032159Global Dossier 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012263657Global Dossier 18.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
US201213532861 26.06.2012
US60724000 30.06.2000
US70184807 01.02.2007
US85406504 25.05.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011306018Global Dossier 15.12.2011A1
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US70184807 01.02.2007
US85406504 25.05.2004
US201113215719 23.08.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007140987Global Dossier 21.06.2007A1
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US70184807 01.02.2007
US85406504 25.05.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2007025928Global Dossier 01.02.2007A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US97596304 28.10.2004
US71044000 10.11.2000
US54188906 02.10.2006
US35120503 24.01.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2006171907Global Dossier 03.08.2006A1
Priority number Date
US73453603 12.12.2003
US3962001 24.10.2001
US16535199 12.11.1999
US45142099 30.11.1999
US69413003 27.10.2003
US75457796 21.11.1996
US20321698 30.11.1998
US71025000 10.11.2000
US39183806 29.03.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005163727Global Dossier 28.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US85406504 25.05.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2005112070Global Dossier 26.05.2005A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US97596304 28.10.2004
US71044000 10.11.2000
US35120503 24.01.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004146466Global Dossier 29.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US73742503 16.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2004126334Global Dossier 01.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US73453603 12.12.2003
US16535199 12.11.1999
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2003206874Global Dossier 06.11.2003A1
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US3962001 24.10.2001
US45142099 30.11.1999
US75457796 21.11.1996
US45484303 05.06.2003
US71044000 10.11.2000
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10376451Global Dossier 13.08.2019B2
US2019183749 20.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201916285713 26.02.2019
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US201715630317 22.06.2017
US201615268692 19.09.2016
US73742503 16.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10369090Global Dossier 06.08.2019B2
US2019167543 06.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US201715630317 22.06.2017
US201615268692 19.09.2016
US73742503 16.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
US201916268855 06.02.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10258550Global Dossier 16.04.2019B2
US2017281485 05.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US201715630317 22.06.2017
US201615268692 19.09.2016
US73742503 16.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10258549Global Dossier 16.04.2019B2
US2017007514 12.01.2017A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US201615268692 19.09.2016
US73742503 16.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9161895Global Dossier 20.10.2015B1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US14050108 17.06.2008
US201514806700 23.07.2015
US73742503 16.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9139731Global Dossier 22.09.2015B2
US2008247973 09.10.2008A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US14050108 17.06.2008
US73742503 16.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7387774Global Dossier 17.06.2008B2
US2004126335 01.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US73438103 12.12.2003
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7063833Global Dossier 20.06.2006B2
US2004086466 06.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US3962001 24.10.2001
US45142099 30.11.1999
US69413003 27.10.2003
US75457796 21.11.1996
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6821507Global Dossier 23.11.2004B2
US2003152527 14.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US71044000 10.11.2000
US35120503 24.01.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2009215307Global Dossier 24.09.2009A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2008143910Global Dossier 26.06.2008A
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2006511553Global Dossier 06.04.2006A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0339630 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2004517038Global Dossier 10.06.2004A
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US0120516 28.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002531388Global Dossier 24.09.2002A
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2002531387Global Dossier 24.09.2002A
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5631870BGlobal Dossier 26.11.2014B2
JP2011522871 04.08.2011A
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
WO2008IB52562 25.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5191985BGlobal Dossier 08.05.2013B2
JP2009531425 03.09.2009A
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4338644BGlobal Dossier 07.10.2009B2
JP2006511533 06.04.2006A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3860471BGlobal Dossier 20.12.2006B2
JP2003513899 15.04.2003A
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2583661Global Dossier 01.06.2016B1
EP2583661 24.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP02794371 20.12.2002
EP10173204 20.12.2002
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2289482Global Dossier 05.06.2013B1
EP2289482 17.08.2011A3
EP2289482 02.03.2011A2
Priority number Date
EP02794371 20.12.2002
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2238965Global Dossier 13.10.2010A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
EP00977110 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1998743Global Dossier 26.06.2013B1
EP1998743 10.12.2008A1
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1569610Global Dossier 20.03.2013B1
EP1569610 07.09.2005A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0339630 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1569609Global Dossier 11.07.2012B1
EP1569609 07.09.2005A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1294383Global Dossier 16.07.2008B1
EP1294383 26.03.2003A2
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US0120516 28.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1227788Global Dossier 11.08.2010B1
EP1227788 07.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1227787Global Dossier 06.07.2016B1
EP1227787 07.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0030808 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1227735Global Dossier 22.10.2003B1
EP1227735 07.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1135099Global Dossier 10.05.2006B1
EP1135099 26.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1135098Global Dossier 23.11.2005B1
EP1135098 26.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0949899Global Dossier 14.08.2002B1
EP0949899 20.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2293850Global Dossier 02.01.2019B1
EP2293850 16.03.2011A2
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
WO2008IB52562 25.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT222087T 15.08.2002T
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT252323T 15.11.2003T
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT310493T 15.12.2005T
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT325639T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT401089T 15.08.2008T
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT476955T 15.08.2010T
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU757450B 20.02.2003B2
AU2028800 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU761437B 05.06.2003B2
AU3103100 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU783179B 29.09.2005B2
AU1479201 06.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0030808 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1479301 06.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3478001 14.08.2001A
Priority number Date
US0017177 22.06.2000
US0103488 02.02.2001
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5202398 10.06.1998A
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5632400 12.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7154501 14.01.2002A
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US0120516 28.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002359807B 17.05.2007B2
AU2002359807 09.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003297923B 06.09.2007B2
AU2003297923B 09.07.2004B9
AU2003297923 09.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0339630 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2006340923B 07.03.2013B2
AU2006340923 04.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2008359213B 15.01.2015B2
AU2008359213 14.01.2010A1
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
WO2008IB52562 25.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9915609 14.08.2001A
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9915753 04.09.2001A
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0621523 13.12.2011A2
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0822894 18.10.2016B1
BRPI0822894 30.06.2015A2
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
WO2008IB52562 25.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2271302 24.12.2002C
CA2271302 28.05.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2348237 11.11.2003C
CA2348237 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2348892 16.12.2003C
CA2348892 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2387153 19.02.2008C
CA2387153 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2389174 23.01.2007C
CA2389174 17.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2391220 26.08.2008C
CA2391220 17.05.2001A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0030808 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2415068 10.03.2009C
CA2415068 10.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US0120516 28.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2508017 28.06.2011C
CA2508017 01.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2508018 17.05.2011C
CA2508018 01.07.2004A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0339630 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2644334 13.11.2012C
CA2644334 04.10.2007A1
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2726077 18.11.2014C
CA2726077 14.01.2010A1
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
WO2008IB52562 25.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1129420C 03.12.2003C
CN1237894 08.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1149067C 12.05.2004C
CN1328442 26.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1154471C 23.06.2004C
CN1328441 26.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1200685C 11.05.2005C
CN1420757 28.05.2003A
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1221179C 05.10.2005C
CN1411343 16.04.2003A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1287803C 06.12.2006C
CN1522149 18.08.2004A
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN100490776C 27.05.2009C
CN1411364 16.04.2003A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1694682 09.11.2005A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN100438851C 03.12.2008C
CN1720022 11.01.2006A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101081195B 15.02.2012B
CN101081195 05.12.2007A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101404976B 28.09.2011B
CN101404976 08.04.2009A
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102056648B 05.11.2014B
CN102056648 11.05.2011A
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
WO2008IB52562 25.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103126913B 18.07.2017B
CN103126913 05.06.2013A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103126922 05.06.2013A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CZ181399 15.09.1999A3
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CZ20011526 17.10.2001A3
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CZ20011721 17.10.2001A3
Priority number Date
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60006148T 22.07.2004T2
DE60006148D 27.11.2003D1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60044819D 23.09.2010D1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60134855D 28.08.2008D1
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US0120516 28.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69714770D 19.09.2002D1
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69714770T 24.04.2003T2
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69928562T 03.08.2006T2
DE69928562D 29.12.2005D1
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69931277T 16.05.2007T2
DE69931277D 14.06.2006D1
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0949899T 07.10.2002T3
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1227735T 23.02.2004T3
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1294383T 10.11.2008T3
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US0120516 28.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2182126T 01.03.2003T3
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2209908T 01.07.2004T3
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2252992T 16.05.2006T3
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2264828T 16.01.2007T3
Priority number Date
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2309077T 16.12.2008T3
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2350177T 19.01.2011T3
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2390872T 19.11.2012T3
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2413385T 16.07.2013T3
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0339630 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2423595T 23.09.2013T3
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2428149T 06.11.2013T3
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2586664T 18.10.2016T3
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2593452T 09.12.2016T3
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0030808 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1023502 06.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0104457 28.02.2006A3
HU0104457 29.04.2002A2
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU0104746 28.02.2006A3
HU0104746 29.04.2002A2
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU9903532 29.10.2001A3
HU9903532 28.03.2000A2
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ID30427 06.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX348634 21.06.2017B
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX360991 23.11.2018B
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA02004787 30.08.2002A
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA02004791 30.08.2002A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0030808 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA02004792 30.08.2002A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA03000041 15.10.2003A
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
US0120516 28.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA05006221 19.08.2005A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0241132 20.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA05006222 19.08.2005A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
US0339630 12.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2008012414 07.10.2008A
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
WO2006US15536 20.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2010014220 21.01.2011A
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
WO2008IB52562 25.06.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20012625L 29.05.2001L
NO20012625D 29.05.2001D0
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20012661L 30.05.2001L
NO20012661D 30.05.2001D0
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
US9927810 23.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO20022239L 12.07.2002L
NO20022239D 10.05.2002D0
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0030808 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ511516 29.08.2003A
Priority number Date
US9927809 23.11.1999
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PE02372002 18.04.2002A1
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL187190B 31.05.2004B1
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL197323B 31.03.2008B1
PL355997 31.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL206023B 30.06.2010B1
PL355965 31.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US0030809 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL207397B 31.12.2010B1
PL378929 12.06.2006A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL356094 14.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US0030808 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL377771 20.02.2006A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL392475 06.12.2010A1
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT949899E 29.11.2002E
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT1294383E 08.10.2008E
Priority number Date
US60724000 30.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2162319 27.01.2001C1
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2002115627 27.01.2004A
RU2219902 27.12.2003C1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2236838 27.09.2004C2
RU2002115621 10.01.2004A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2240016 20.11.2004C2
RU2002115622 27.03.2004A
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2311899 10.12.2007C2
RU2005118405 20.11.2005A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2311901 10.12.2007C2
RU2005118406 27.01.2006A
Priority number Date
US31910802 13.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2443408 27.02.2012C2
RU2008134918 10.05.2010A
Priority number Date
US39183806 29.03.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SK282712B 06.11.2002B6
SK68099 18.01.2000A3
Priority number Date
US9721029 18.11.1997
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TR199901100T 21.07.1999T2
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TR200101527T 22.10.2001T2
Priority number Date
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TR200101532T 22.10.2001T2
Priority number Date
US20321598 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TR200201262T 23.12.2002T2
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5939052 17.08.1999A
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6187295 13.02.2001B1
Priority number Date
US75457796 21.11.1996
US20321598 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6350436 26.02.2002B1
Priority number Date
US45142099 30.11.1999
US75457796 21.11.1996
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6555094 29.04.2003B1
Priority number Date
US16535099 12.11.1999
US71044000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6667027 23.12.2003B2
US2002106336 08.08.2002A1
Priority number Date
US3962001 24.10.2001
US45142099 30.11.1999
US75457796 21.11.1996
US20321698 30.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6685920 03.02.2004B2
US2003165442 04.09.2003A1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US31910802 13.12.2002
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6713049 30.03.2004B1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US71025000 10.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6926916 09.08.2005B1
Priority number Date
US16535199 12.11.1999
US83146201 09.05.2001
US0017177 22.06.2000
US18035200 04.02.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2010004361Global Dossier 10.09.2010A3
WO2010004361 14.01.2010A2
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20110005736Global Dossier 18.01.2011A
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2010148562 27.07.2012A
Priority number Date
US14050108 17.06.2008