blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2293850

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure23.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase22.11.2010National basic fee paid 
22.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
02.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
17.01.201103   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2011
30.06.201104   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2011
European patent granted02.01.2019
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.03.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20101122
 
Event date:16.03.2011 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:16.03.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:21.09.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:20.02.2013 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20130125
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 6/00 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61Q 11/00 20060101AFI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 8/55 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C08G 65/335 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 8/21 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 8/19 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C08L 71/02 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 8/81 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:20.06.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 8/24 20060101ALI20180517BHEP
 
Event date:25.07.2018 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20180625
 
Event date:15.08.2018 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED)
 
Event date:05.09.2018 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20180808
 
Event date:02.01.2019 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:02.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1083637 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20190115
 
Event date:15.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:23.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:24.01.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602008058598 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:08.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)
Effective DATE:20190102
 
Event date:27.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT