Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2293850

EP2293850 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING OVERALL TOOTH HEALTH AND APPEARANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 02.01.2019  [2019/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2011/11]
Inventor(s)01 / BAIG, Arif, Ali
7788 Birchwood Court
Mason Ohio 45040 / US
02 / FALLER, Robert, Vincent
11713 Park Court
Loveland Ohio 45140 / US
03 / DECKNER, George, Endel
10572 Tanager Hills Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45249 / US
 [2011/11]
Representative(s)Joos, Uta Susanne , et al
Braun GmbH
Patentabteilung
Frankfurter Straße 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[2012/48]
Former [2011/11]Clemo, Nicholas Graham
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date08789160.225.06.2008
[2011/11]
WO2008IB52562
Priority number, dateUS2008014050117.06.2008         Original published format: US 140501
[2011/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010004361
Date:14.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2293850
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010
[2011/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2293850
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61Q11/00, A61K8/24, A61K8/19, A61K8/21, A61K8/81, A61K6/00, C08L71/02, A61K8/55, C08G65/335
[2018/25]
Former International [2011/11]A61Q11/00, A61K8/81
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/01]
Former [2011/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR GESAMTVERBESSERUNG DER ZAHNGESUNDHEIT UND DES AUSSEHENS[2011/11]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING OVERALL TOOTH HEALTH AND APPEARANCE[2011/11]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER LA SANTÉ DENTAIRE GLOBALE ET L'APPARENCE DES DENTS[2011/11]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2010National basic fee paid 
22.11.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2010Examination requested  [2011/11]
30.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2018Fee for grant paid
23.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
02.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
17.01.201103   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2011
30.06.201104   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.2011
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2008049878  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 * claims 1-11 * * examples 1-2 * * examples 3-4 * * page 6, line 27 - page 6, line 29 * [Y] 1-9 [I] 6-9;
 [XYI]EP0569666  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3 * claims 1-10 * * page 2, line 41 - line 45 * * page 2, line 12 - line 12; examples 1-11 * [Y] 1-9 [I] 8,9;
 [XY]EP0555864  (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 3,8,9 * examples 5,8,9 * * page 8, line 14 - line 15 * * table 2 * [Y] 1,2,4-7;
 [XYI]US5824289  (STOLTZ EDWIN I [US]) [X] 3,8 * examples 2-5 * * column 4, line 20 - column 4, line 35 * * claims 1,14,15 * [Y] 2,4-7 [I] 1,9;
 [XY]US4036950  (BAINES ERIC, et al) [X] 3,8 * column 1, line 23 - line 26 * * column 3, line 6 - column 3, line 24 * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 1,2,4-7,9