blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2173371

EP2173371 - PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM PLASMINOGEN ACTIVATOR INHIBITOR-1 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2012
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thrombotech Ltd.
9 Hamazmera Street
74047 Ness Ziona / IL
[2010/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HIGAZI, Abd Al-Roof
Neve Shalom
99761 Mobile Post Shimshon / IL
 [2010/15]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Bavariastraße 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/44]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2010/15]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08789703.924.07.2008
[2010/15]
WO2008IL01027
Priority number, dateUS20070951485P24.07.2007         Original published format: US 951485 P
[2010/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009013753
Date:29.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2173371
Date:14.04.2010
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2010/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2173371
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.01.2009
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/08, C07K14/435
[2010/15]
CPC:
C07K14/8132 (EP,US); A61P25/00 (EP); A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP); A61P25/28 (EP); A61K38/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/15]
TitleGerman:PEPTIDE AUS DEM PLASMINOGENAKTIVATOR-HEMMER 1 UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2010/15]
English:PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM PLASMINOGEN ACTIVATOR INHIBITOR-1 AND USES THEREOF[2010/15]
French:PEPTIDES ISSUS DE L'INHIBITEUR 1 DE L'ACTIVATEUR DU PLASMINOGÈNE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2010/15]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2010National basic fee paid 
19.01.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.01.2010Examination requested  [2010/15]
26.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2011Fee for grant paid
21.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11186422.9  / EP2468289
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.05.2010
Opposition(s)03.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.07.2008
AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
IE24.07.2012
LU24.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
IE24.07.2012
LU24.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2014/21]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
TR02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
IE24.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/35]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
MT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
IE24.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/33]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
IE24.07.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/29]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
FI02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
ES13.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/11]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
MC31.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT02.11.2011
BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/37]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
IT02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/36]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
RO02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
SK02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/35]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
EE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
BG02.02.2012
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/34]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
CZ02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/28]BE02.11.2011
CY02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/27]BE02.11.2011
HR02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/26]BE02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
PL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/25]BE02.11.2011
LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/24]LT02.11.2011
LV02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
SE02.11.2011
SI02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/23]LT02.11.2011
NL02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
GR03.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
PT02.03.2012
Former [2012/21]LT02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
IS02.03.2012
Former [2012/20]LT02.11.2011
NO02.02.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9920295  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-19,21-28 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 9 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 6 * * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 28 * * page 18, line 20 - page 19, line 4 *;
 [XA]WO0234776  (LEUVEN K U RES & DEV [BE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 26 - line 28 * * page 5, line 5 - line 6 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 5 * * page 35; claims 3,7 * [A] 2-28;
 [X]WO03095476  (THROMBOTECH LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-11,13-19,21-28 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, line 1 * * page 21, paragraph 1 *;
 [PX]WO2008018084  (THROMBOTECH LTD [IL], et al) [PX] 1-28 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 7 * * page 28; claims 1-5 ** page 29; claim 7 *;
 [XA]  - KORKMAZ BRICE ET AL, "Discriminating between the activities of human neutrophil elastase and proteinase 3 using serpin-derived fluorogenic substrates.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20021018), vol. 277, no. 42, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 39074 - 39081, XP002497875 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 39076; figure 1 * [A] 2-28

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M202918200
 [XA]  - JOSLIN G ET AL, "CROSS-COMPETITION FOR BINDING OF ALPHA1-ANTITRYPSIN (ALPHA1 AT)- ELASTASE COMPLEXES TO THE SERPIN-ENZYME COMPLEX RECEPTOR BY OTHER SERPIN-ENZYME COMPLEXES AND BY PROTEOLYTICALLY MODIFIED ALPHA1 AT", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,; US, (19930125), vol. 268, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1886 - 1893, XP002054745 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 1889; figure 3 * [A] 2-28
 [XD]  - ARMSTEAD WILLIAM M ET AL, "Neutralizing the neurotoxic effects of exogenous and endogenous tPA", NATURE NEUROSCIENCE, (200609), vol. 9, no. 9, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 1150 - 1155, XP002497876 [XD] 1-11,13-19,21-28 * abstract * * page 1151; figure 1 * * page 1152; figures 4,5 * * page 1153, column L, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1757
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.