Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2190344

EP2190344 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION FOR MONITORING A TISSUE OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/22]METHOD, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR USING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION FOR MONITORING A TISSUE OF A USER
[2017/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensible Medical Innovations Ltd.
4 HaAlon Street
4059300 Kfar Neter / IL
[2018/07]
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Sensible Medical Innovations Ltd.
99 HaHashmonaim Street
67133 Tel-Aviv / IL
Inventor(s)01 / SAROKA, Amir
6 Hestorei HaParchi Street
Apt. 4
62743 Tel-aviv / IL
02 / BERGIDA, Shlomi
27 Shalom Aleichem Street
63344 Tel-aviv / IL
03 / MIZRAHI, Nadav
7 Onkelus Street
62916 Tel-aviv / IL
04 / RAPPAPORT, Dan
107 Jabotinsky Street
62191 Tel-aviv / IL
05 / RONEN, Amir
17 Reut Street
45296 Hod-hasharon / IL
06 / ALMOG, Benyamin
89 HaLevona Street
71947 Beit Arie / IL
 [2017/52]
Former [2010/22]01 / SAROKA, Amir
6 Hestorei HaParchi Street Apt. 4
62743 Tel-aviv / IL
02 / BERGIDA, Shlomi
27 Shalom Aleichem Street
63344 Tel-aviv / IL
03 / MIZRAHI, Nadav
7 Onkelus Street
62916 Tel-aviv / IL
04 / RAPPAPORT, Dan
107 Jabotinsky Street
62191 Tel-aviv / IL
05 / RONEN, Amir
17 Reut Street
45296 Hod-hasharon / IL
06 / ALMOG, Benyamin
89 HaLevona Street
71947 Beit Arie / IL
Representative(s)Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Postfach 70 04 25
81304 München / DE
[2017/52]
Former [2012/47]Dennemeyer & Associates S.A.
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2010/22]Fichter, Robert Arno
Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08789867.204.09.2008
[2010/22]
WO2008IL01198
Priority number, dateUS20070969963P05.09.2007         Original published format: US 969963 P
US20070969965P05.09.2007         Original published format: US 969965 P
US20070969966P05.09.2007         Original published format: US 969966 P
[2010/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009031149
Date:12.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2190344
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009
[2010/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2190344
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.03.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05, // A61B5/024, A61B5/11
[2013/11]
Former International [2010/22]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/52]
Former [2010/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR VERWENDUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES GEWEBES EINES ANWENDERS[2017/29]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION FOR MONITORING A TISSUE OF A USER[2017/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'UTILISATION D'UN RAYONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE POUR CONTRÔLER UN TISSU CHEZ UN UTILISATEUR[2017/29]
Former [2010/22]VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND GERÄT ZUR VERWENDUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER STRAHLUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES GEWEBES EINES ANWENDERS
Former [2010/22]METHOD, SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR USING ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION FOR MONITORING A TISSUE OF A USER
Former [2010/22]PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET APPAREIL D'UTILISATION D'UN RAYONNEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE POUR CONTRÔLER UN TISSU CHEZ UN UTILISATEUR
Entry into regional phase06.04.2010National basic fee paid 
06.04.2010Search fee paid 
06.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
03.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2017Fee for grant paid
15.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17020594.2  / EP3415090
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.10.2013
Opposition(s)28.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE04.09.2018
LU04.09.2018
MT04.09.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/33]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
IE04.09.2018
LU04.09.2018
Former [2019/30]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
LU04.09.2018
Former [2019/24]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
MC27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2019/13]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SI27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
DK27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
RO27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT27.12.2017
CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
IS27.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY27.12.2017
CZ27.12.2017
EE27.12.2017
FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
PL27.12.2017
SK27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/25]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
LV27.12.2017
BG27.03.2018
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI27.12.2017
HR27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
GR28.03.2018
Former [2018/21]FI27.12.2017
LT27.12.2017
NO27.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2003036713  (BOUTON CHAD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0037] , [0081] - [0088]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,5-8,11 [I] 14;
 [X]US2007066904  (WIESMANN WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US5002060  (NEDIVI DROR [IL]) [Y] 5-7 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 60 *;
 [Y]US2004186395  (VASTANO GAETANO F [US]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0069] , [0056] , [0065] *;
 [Y]US2006258952  (STAHMANN JEFFREY E [US], et al) [Y] 3,8 * paragraph [0039] *
International search[X]US6496711  (ATHAN STEPHAN PETER [US], et al);
 [X]US6015386  (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al);
 [X]US6281843  (EVTIOUSHKINE GUENNADI [KR], et al);
 [Y]US2004073093  (HATLESTAD JOHN [US]);
 [Y]US2004254457  (VAN DER WEIDE DANIEL WARREN [US]);
 [Y]WO0071207  (EXOGEN INC [US]);
 [Y]US7116276  (LEE JAE CHAN [KR]);
 [Y]US6577709  (TARR RANDALL V [US]);
 [Y]US2004148021  (CARTLEDGE RICHARD G [US], et al)
ExaminationUS4991585
 US2004006279