Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2301242

EP2301242 - MULTI-PREVIEW CAPABILITY FOR VIDEO PRODUCTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.03.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GVBB Holdings S.A.R.L
412F, route d'Esch
2086 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [2011/13]For all designated states
GVBB Holdings S.A.R.L
412F route d'Esch
2086 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2011/13]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
46, Quai A. Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Bret, Michael
16106 Cook Road
Rough&Ready California 95975 / US
02 / CASPER, David, Alan
12995 Pinewoods Road
Naveda City California 95959 / US
 [2011/13]
Representative(s)Hill, Justin John , et al
Dentons UKMEA LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/41]Hill, Justin John , et al
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London
WC1V 6XX / GB
Former [2013/25]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse
Carrington House
126-130 Regent Street
London
W1B 5SE / GB
Former [2011/13]Hill, Justin John , et al
IPULSE 9-10 Savile Row
London, W1S 3PF / GB
Application number, filing date08794515.016.07.2008
[2011/13]
WO2008US08655
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010008361
Date:21.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2301242
Date:30.03.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2010
[2011/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/268
[2011/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/13]
TitleGerman:MEHRFACHVORSCHAUFÄHIGKEIT FÜR EINE VIDEOPRODUKTIONSEINRICHTUNG[2011/13]
English:MULTI-PREVIEW CAPABILITY FOR VIDEO PRODUCTION DEVICE[2011/13]
French:CAPACITÉ DE PRÉVISUALISATION MULTIPLE POUR DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION VIDÉO[2011/13]
Entry into regional phase13.01.2011National basic fee paid 
13.01.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
13.01.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2011Examination requested  [2011/13]
13.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
02.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
02.04.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination02.06.2014Appeal received No.  T1803/14
01.08.2014Statement of grounds filed
28.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201104   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2329540  (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2003214605  (SNYDER ROBERT J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0101] - [0109]; figures 8,9 *;
 [X]EP0463719  (GRASS VALLEY GROUP [US]) [X] 1,2,6-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7024677  (SNYDER ROBERT J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column 8, line 53 - column 11, line 40 *;
 [A]US5166797  (ANGELL RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *